EP2101756 - METHOD OF TREATING HYPERESTHESIA, PARESTHESIA, DOLOR, AND PRURITUS CAUSED BY INSECT STINGS OR NOXIOUS WEEDS OR PLANTS USING AVERMECTIN COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galderma S.A. World Trade Center Avenue Gratta-Paille 1 1000 Lausanne 30 Grey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Galderma S.A. World Trade Center Avenue de Gratta-Paille 1 1000 Lausanne 30 Grey / CH | ||
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Parks, Jeffrey, D. Parks Dermatology Center, P.A. 400 Lakebridge Plaza Drive Ormond Beach, FL 32174 / US | ||
For all designated states Parks, L. Dean 4185 SE 20th Street Ocala FL 34471 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parks, Jeffrey D. Parks Dermatology Center, p.a., 400 Lakebridge Plaza Drive Ormond Beach Florida 32174 / US | 02 /
Parks, Dean L. 4185 Se 20th Street Ocala Florida 34471 / US | [2013/03] |
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08712919.3 | 02.01.2008 | [2009/39] | WO2008US00007 | Priority number, date | US20070648941 | 03.01.2007 Original published format: US 648941 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008085808 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2101756 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2101756 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/366, A61K31/35, A61P17/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61K31/366 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/39] | A61K31/35 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERÄSTHESIE, PARÄSTHESIE, SCHMERZEN ODER JUCKREIZ INFOLGE VON INSEKTENSTICHEN ODER SCHÄDLICHEN KRÄUTERN ODER PFLANZEN MITTELS EINER AVERMECTIN-VERBINDUNG | [2012/47] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING HYPERESTHESIA, PARESTHESIA, DOLOR, AND PRURITUS CAUSED BY INSECT STINGS OR NOXIOUS WEEDS OR PLANTS USING AVERMECTIN COMPOUND | [2009/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERESTHÉSIE, DE LA PARESTHÉSIE, DE LA DOULEUR ET DU PRURIT CAUSÉS PAR DES PIQÛRES D'INSECTE OU DES PLANTES OU DES MAUVAISES HERBES NUISIBLES, À L'AIDE D'UN COMPOSÉ D'AVERMECTINE | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/39] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERÄSTHESIE, PARÄSTHESIE, SCHMERZEN ODER JUCKREIZ INFOLGE VON INSEKTENSTICHEN ODER SCHÄDLICHEN KRÄUTERN ODER PFLANZEN MITTELS EINES AVERMECTIN-VERBINDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   21.03.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004167084 (PARKS L DEAN [US]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0053] , [0045] - [0048] *; | [A] - STIBICH, ADAM S. MD; YAGAN, MARK MD; SHARMA, VIDYA MD; HERNDON, BETTY PHD; MONTGOMERY, CHRISTOPHER MS, "Cost-effective post-exposure prevention of poison ivy dermatitis", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, vol. 39, no. 7, (200007), pages 515 - 518, URL: http://www3.interscience.wiley.com/cgi-bin/fulltext/120189105/HTMLSTARTW, (20091120), XP002556566 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/J.1365-4362.2000.00003.X | International search | [A]US6399652 (PARKS L DEAN [US]) | [X] - JENKINS E.J. ET AL., "Development and pathogenesis of Parelaphostrongylus odocoilei (nematoda: protostrongylidae) in experimentally infected thinhorn sheep (Ovis dalli)", JOURNAL OF WILDLIFE DISEASES, (200510), vol. 41, no. 4, pages 669 - 682, XP008111187 | [X] - LEO'N-VIZCAI'NO L. ET AL., "Experimental ivermectin treatment of sarcoptic mange and establishment of a mange-free population of Spanish ibex", JOURNAL OF WILDLIFE DISEASES, (200110), vol. 37, no. 4, pages 775 - 785, XP008111188 | [A] - HENGGE U.R. ET AL., "Scabies: a ubiquitous neglected skin disease", THE LANCET INFECTIOUS DISEASE, (200612), vol. 6, no. 12, pages 769 - 779, XP005774623 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1473-3099(06)70654-5 | by applicant | US5952372 | US6133310 | US6433006 | US6399652 | US6399651 | US6319945 | US4310519 | US4199569 | US4206205 | US4171314 | US4173571 | US4201861 | US5055454 | US5077308 | US5162363 | US5229416 | US5262400 | US4333925 | US4963667 | US5114930 | US5350742 | US5830875 | - MAGDA ET AL., AMER, J. TROP. MED. HYG., (1995), vol. 53, no. 6, pages 652 - 653 |