EP2117422 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A CEREBROVASCULAR AUTOREGULATION STATE OF A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, MD 21218 / US | [2015/50] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states The Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore MD 21218 / US | ||
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore MD 21218 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADY, Ken, M. Johns Hopkins University School of Medicine Department of Anesthesiology Division of Pediatric Anethesiology and Critical Care Medicine 600 North Wolfe Street, Blalock 904 Baltimore, Maryland 21287 / US | [2015/50] |
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
BRADY, Ken, M. Johns Hopkins University School of Medicine Department of Anesthesiology Division of Pediatric Anethesiology and Critical Care Medicine 600 North Wolfe Street, Blalock 904 Baltimore, Maryland 21287 / US | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2009/47] | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08713011.8 | 04.01.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008US00170 | Priority number, date | US20070899146P | 02.02.2007 Original published format: US 899146 P | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008097411 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117422 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2117422 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/02, A61B5/145, G01N33/49, G06Q50/00, A61B5/021, // A61B5/026, A61B5/03 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
A61B5/02 (KR);
A61B5/02028 (EP,US);
A61B5/021 (EP,US);
A61B5/0261 (EP,US);
A61B5/14 (KR);
A61B5/14553 (EP,US);
A61B5/4064 (EP,US);
A61B5/022 (EP,US);
A61B5/031 (EP,US);
A61B5/1459 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | A61B5/02, G01N33/49, G06Q50/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/50] |
Former [2009/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES ZEREBROVASKULÄREN AUTOREGULATIONSZUSTANDS EINES PATIENTEN | [2009/47] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A CEREBROVASCULAR AUTOREGULATION STATE OF A PATIENT | [2009/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR DÉTERMINER UN ÉTAT D'AUTORÉGULATION CÉRÉBROVASCULAIRE D'UN PATIENT | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 08.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.01.2008 | AT | 09.12.2015 | BE | 09.12.2015 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | CZ | 09.12.2015 | DK | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | ES | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | HR | 09.12.2015 | IT | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | LV | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | NL | 09.12.2015 | PL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | SE | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | TR | 09.12.2015 | IE | 04.01.2016 | LU | 04.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | NO | 09.03.2016 | GR | 10.03.2016 | IS | 09.04.2016 | PT | 11.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.01.2008 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.01.2008 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
IE | 04.01.2016 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6802812 (WALKER STEPHEN D [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * column 4, lines 18-19,56-57 * * column 8, lines 59-61 * * column 11, lines 38-55 *; | [Y]DE10331027 (SELEON GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0037] , [0038] *; | [A]US2006094964 (RAGAUSKAS ARMINAS [LT], et al) [A] 1,6,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0036] , [0053] *; | [IY] - JAEGER MATTHIAS ET AL, "Continuous assessment of cerebrovascular autoregulation after traumatic brain injury using brain tissue oxygen pressure reactivity", CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, WILLIAMS AND WILKINGS COMPANY, BALTIMORE, MA, US, (20060101), vol. 34, no. 6, ISSN 0090-3493, pages 1783 - 1788, XP009161683 [I] 1,5,6,8 * the whole document * [Y] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.CCM.0000218413.51546.9E | [IY] - RALF STEINMEIER ET AL, "Slow Rhythmic Oscillations of Blood Pressure, Intracranial Pressure, Microcirculation, and Cerebral Oxygenation", STROKE, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, (19961201), vol. 27, no. 12, doi:10.1161/?01.STR.27.12.2236, ISSN 0039-2499, pages 2236 - 2243, XP009161681 [I] 1-3,5-8 * the whole document * [Y] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/?01.STR.27.12.2236 | [A] - LANG ERHARD W ET AL, "Tissue oxygen reactivity and cerebral autoregulation after severe traumatic brain injury", CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, WILLIAMS AND WILKINGS COMPANY, BALTIMORE, MA, US, (20030101), vol. 31, no. 1, ISSN 0090-3493, pages 267 - 271, XP009161682 [A] 1,6,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00003246-200301000-00042 | [A] - JES F SCHMIDT ET AL, "Computerized analysis of cerebral blood flow autoregulation in humans: validation of a method for pharmaceutical studies", JOURNAL OF CARDIOVASCULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (19900101), vol. 15, pages 983 - 988, XP055034580 [A] 1,6,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00005344-199006000-00017 | International search | [Y]US2006094964 (RAGAUSKAS ARMINAS [LT], et al); | [Y]US6802812 (WALKER STEPHEN D [US], et al) | by applicant | US6802812 | DE10331027 | - CZOSNYKA M; SMIELEWSKI P; KIRKPATRICK P; MENON DK; PICKARD JD, "Monitoring of cerebral autoregulation in head-injured patients", STROKE, (1996), vol. 27, no. 10, pages 1829 - 1834 | - LAM JM; HSIANG JN; POON WS., "Monitoring of autoregulation using laser doppler flowmetry in patients with head injury.", J NEUROSURG., (1997), vol. 86, no. 3, pages 438 - 445 | - LANG EW; CZOSNYKA M; MEHDOM HM., "Tissue oxygen reactivity and cerebral autoregulation after severe traumatic brain injury.", CRIT CARE MED., (2003), vol. 31, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1097/00003246-200301000-00042, pages 267 - 271, XP009161682 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00003246-200301000-00042 | - JAEGER M; SCHUHMANN MU; SOEHLE M; MEIXENSBERGER J., "Continuous assessment of cerebrovascular autoregulation after traumatic brain injury using brain tissue oxygen pressure reactivity.", CRIT CARE MED., (2006), vol. 34, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1097/01.CCM.0000218413.51546.9E, pages 1783 - 1788, XP009161683 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.CCM.0000218413.51546.9E | - TSUJI M; SAUL JP; DU PLESSIS A ET AL., "Cerebral intravascular oxygenation correlates with mean arterial pressure in critically ill premature infants.", PEDIATRICS, (2000), vol. 106, no. 4, pages 625 - 632 | - CZOSNYKA M; SMIELEWSKI P; KIRKPATRICK P; LAING RJ; MENON D; PICKARD JD, "Continuous assessment of the cerebral vasomotor reactivity in head injury.", NEUROSURGERY, (1997), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 11 - 7,17-9 |