EP2125253 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SORTING DISSIMILAR MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valerio, Thomas A. 1434 Kelton Drive Stone Mountain, GA 30083 / US | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08713037.3 | 07.01.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008US00201 | Priority number, date | US20070878856P | 05.01.2007 Original published format: US 878856 P | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008085945 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2125253 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B07C5/342, B07C5/36 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
B07C5/3416 (EP,US);
B07C5/3427 (EP,US);
B07C5/362 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/49] | B07C5/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Extension states | AL | 20.07.2009 | BA | 20.07.2009 | MK | 20.07.2009 | RS | 20.07.2009 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SORTIERUNG UNGLEICHER MATERIALIEN | [2009/49] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SORTING DISSIMILAR MATERIALS | [2009/49] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR TRIER DES MATÉRIAUX DIFFÉRENTS | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 22.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 27.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/53] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4305006 (BUEHLER AG [CH]) [X] 1-8,17-21 * column 1, lines 1-19; figure 1 * * columns 3,6,7; figure 1 *; | [X]US2006081513 (KENNY GARRY R [US]) [X] 1-8,17-21 * paragraphs [0006] , [0064] , [0077] - [0080]; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US2002027943 (YOKOYAMA SADAHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,17-21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] , [0018] , [0068]; figure 4 *; | [I]GB2188727 (DE BEERS IND DIAMOND) [I] 1-8,17-21 * page 1, lines 35-126; figure 1 * | International search | [X]US6112903 (KIMMEL KEVIN S [US], et al); | [Y]US5555324 (WAXMAN ALLEN M [US], et al); | [Y]US6313422 (ANIBAS FRANZ [AT]); | [Y]US5344026 (BOOTH HUBERT J [US], et al); | [Y]US2001045378 (CHARLES DAVID F [US], et al) | by applicant | DE4305006 | US6112903 |