EP2131772 - IMPEDANCE COMPUTATION FOR ABLATION THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | [2009/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHUSHAN, Nikhil 16779 39Tth Avenue North Plymouth, MN 55446 / US | 02 /
SKWAREK, Thomas R. 1224 Woodcrest Avenue Shoreview, MN 55126 / US | 03 /
SPALL, Charles Graham 1812 E. Medicine Lake Boulevard Plymouth, MN 55441 / US | 04 /
BOSACKER, Keith S. 649 Old Highway 8 NW - 306 New Brighton, MN 55112 / US | [2010/02] |
Former [2009/51] | 01 /
BHUSHAN, Nikhil 16779 39Tth Avenue North Plymouth, MN 55446 / US | ||
02 /
SKWAREK, Thomas R. 1224 Woodcrest Avenue Shoreview, MN 55126 / US | |||
03 /
SPALL, Charles Graham 1812 E. Medicine Lake Boulevard Plymouth, MN 55441 / US | |||
04 /
BOSACKER, Keith S. 2551 38th Avenue NE Apt. 447 St. Anthony, MN 55421 / US | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08713476.3 | 03.01.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008US50129 | Priority number, date | US20070891100P | 22.02.2007 Original published format: US 891100 P | US20070694526 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: US 694526 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008103499 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2131772 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2131772 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12, A61B18/14 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B18/1233 (US);
A61B18/14 (US);
A61B18/16 (US);
A61B18/1477 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (US);
A61B2018/00648 (US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00827 (US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1425 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1467 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | IMPEDANZBERECHNUNG FÜR DIE ABLATIONSTHERAPIE | [2009/51] | English: | IMPEDANCE COMPUTATION FOR ABLATION THERAPY | [2009/51] | French: | CALCUL D'IMPÉDANCE POUR THÉRAPIE D'ABLATION | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 29.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.2010 | BE | 13.10.2010 | CY | 13.10.2010 | CZ | 13.10.2010 | DK | 13.10.2010 | EE | 13.10.2010 | FI | 13.10.2010 | HR | 13.10.2010 | HU | 13.10.2010 | IT | 13.10.2010 | LT | 13.10.2010 | LV | 13.10.2010 | MT | 13.10.2010 | NL | 13.10.2010 | PL | 13.10.2010 | RO | 13.10.2010 | SE | 13.10.2010 | SI | 13.10.2010 | SK | 13.10.2010 | TR | 13.10.2010 | IE | 03.01.2011 | LU | 03.01.2011 | BG | 13.01.2011 | NO | 13.01.2011 | GR | 14.01.2011 | ES | 24.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | IS | 13.02.2011 | PT | 14.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
TR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 03.01.2011 | ||
LU | 03.01.2011 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 03.01.2011 | ||
LU | 03.01.2011 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 03.01.2011 | ||
LU | 03.01.2011 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 03.01.2011 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6293941 (STRUL BRUNO [US], et al) [A] 17-23* the whole document *; | [A]WO03008039 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 17-32 * figures 1,3 * * page 2, line 14 - line 31 * * page 5, line 20 - page 9, line 17 *; | [A]US2004015160 (LOVEWELL JAMES G [US]) [A] 17-23 * figures 1,5,7,8 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0042] *; | [A]WO2006045090 (RESECT MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [A] 17-23 * the whole document * |