EP2126414 - Cam FOR DRIVING A PISTON PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/49] | DEVICE FOR DRIVING A PISTON PUMP | ||
[2010/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Wernerstrasse 51 70469 Stuttgart-Feuerbach / DE | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNHAUPT, Martin Knollengutweg 22 A-5411 Oberalm / AT | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte OG Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 08714296.4 | 19.03.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008AT00099 | Priority number, date | AT20070000467 | 26.03.2007 Original published format: AT 4672007 | [2009/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008116241 | Date: | 02.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2126414 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2126414 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16H53/00, F01L1/08, F02M59/10, F04B9/04 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
F01L1/08 (EP,KR,US);
F02M59/10 (KR);
F02M59/102 (EP,US);
F02M59/44 (KR);
F04B9/04 (KR);
F04B9/042 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | Nocke ZUM ANTREIBEN EINER KOLBENPUMPE | [2010/09] | English: | Cam FOR DRIVING A PISTON PUMP | [2010/09] | French: | Came D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UNE POMPE À PISTON | [2010/09] |
Former [2009/49] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANTREIBEN EINER KOLBENPUMPE | ||
Former [2009/49] | DEVICE FOR DRIVING A PISTON PUMP | ||
Former [2009/49] | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UNE POMPE À PISTON | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 19.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | HR | 28.07.2010 | HU | 28.07.2010 | IE | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | LV | 28.07.2010 | MT | 28.07.2010 | NL | 28.07.2010 | PL | 28.07.2010 | PT | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | NO | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | LU | 19.03.2011 | BE | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PT | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
TR | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
LU | 19.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/32] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PT | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
LU | 19.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
LU | 19.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
HR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
NO | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2804863 (WOLF-DIETER BENSINGER, et al) [A] 1,6 * column 1, lines 15-19 * * column 2, lines 30-65 * * column 3, lines 18,19; figure - *; | [A]DE2329734 (AUTOMOBILOVE ZAVODY NP) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * page 4; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US3981281 (DESCHLER GERHARD, et al) [A] 1,2,6,7 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2133467 (SWANSON DARREN GALE) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [DA]US4757795 (KELLY WILLIAM W [US]) [DA] 1,6* abstract *; | [A]WO2005040558 (PATTAKOS MANOUSOS [GR], et al) [A] 6 * paragraphs [0019] , [0022] , [0026]; figures 1-3 * |