EP2173353 - Composition including Adenosine and Lignocaine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/15] | TRANSPLANTS | ||
[2014/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR State(s) deleted from list of lapses: MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hibernation Therapeutics, a KF LLC 2140 S. Dupont Highway Camden, DE / US | [2014/14] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Hibernation Therapeutics Limited 14 Dahl Cresent Wulguru, QLD 4811 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOBSON, Geoffrey 14 Dahl Crescent Wulguru, Queensland 4811 / AU | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/19] |
Former [2010/15] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08714339.2 | 03.03.2008 | [2010/15] | WO2008AU00289 | Priority number, date | AU2007901098P | 02.03.2007 Original published format: AU 2007901098 P | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008106724 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2173353 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2173353 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 12.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/53, A01N1/02, A61K31/167, A61P41/00, A61K45/06 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
A01N1/0226 (EP,US);
A01N1/02 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/53 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P41/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/167, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/53, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2010/15] | A61K31/53, A01N1/02, A61K31/167, A61P41/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/19] |
Former [2010/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung mit Adenosin und Lignocain | [2014/44] | English: | Composition including Adenosine and Lignocaine | [2014/44] | French: | Composition avec de l'adénosine et de la lidocaïne | [2014/44] |
Former [2010/15] | TRANSPLANTATE | ||
Former [2010/15] | TRANSPLANTS | ||
Former [2010/15] | TRANSPLANTS | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 05.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 29.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.09.2014 | 22.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Request for further processing for: | 05.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 05.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 05.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 05.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2010 | Decision despatched | 05.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 05.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 05.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 05.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 05.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 05.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 05.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 05.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2008 | AT | 06.05.2015 | BE | 06.05.2015 | CY | 06.05.2015 | CZ | 06.05.2015 | DK | 06.05.2015 | EE | 06.05.2015 | ES | 06.05.2015 | FI | 06.05.2015 | HR | 06.05.2015 | IT | 06.05.2015 | LT | 06.05.2015 | LV | 06.05.2015 | MC | 06.05.2015 | NL | 06.05.2015 | PL | 06.05.2015 | RO | 06.05.2015 | SE | 06.05.2015 | SI | 06.05.2015 | SK | 06.05.2015 | TR | 06.05.2015 | BG | 06.08.2015 | NO | 06.08.2015 | GR | 07.08.2015 | IS | 06.09.2015 | PT | 07.09.2015 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.03.2008 | |
AT | 06.05.2015 | ||
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO0056145 (UNIV JAMES COOK [AU], et al) [XD] 1-7 * claims 1,9,10,18,19,22 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 4, lines 25-31 * | International search | [X]WO0056145 (UNIV JAMES COOK [AU], et al); | [X]WO2004056180 (GLOBAL CARDIAC SOLUTIONS PTY L [AU], et al); | [X]WO2004000331 (GLOBAL CARDIAC SOLUTIONS PTY L [AU], et al); | [X]US5407793 (DEL NIDO PEDRO J [US], et al); | CN1176738 [ ] (CHANGZHENG HOSPITAL SHANGHAI [CN]); | [XP]WO2007030198 (HUMAN BIOSYSTEMS [US], et al); | CN101019529 [ ] (NANJING ZHONGMAI BIOMEDICINE C [CN]) | [X] - KUSANO T. ET AL., "Organ preserving effect of lidocaine administration in the model of orthotopic liver transplantation from non-heart-beating donors", TRANSPLANTATION PROCEEDINGS, (1996), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 1928 - 1929, XP008129032 | [X] - CAPLUS, Database accession no. (132:242003), XP008120447 | [X] - AR'RAJAB A. ET AL., "Improved liver preservation for transplantation due to calcium channel blockade", TRANSPLANTATION, (1991), vol. 51, no. 5, pages 965 - 967, XP008128972 | [XP] - CAPLUS, Database accession no. (147:317797), XP008120480 | Examination | US6955814 | by applicant | US6955814 | WO2004056180 | WO2004056181 | US6372723 | WO2004000331 | WO0056145 | - BUTLER MM ET AL., LAB ANIM SCI., (1990), vol. 40, pages 277 - 83 | - LANGTON PD ET AL., AJP, (1991), vol. 260, pages H927 - 34 | - HOFFMAN MH ET AL., EVIDENCE-BASED MEDICINE, (2006), vol. 11, page 24 |