EP2134425 - TREADMILL BELT WITH LAYER OF THERMOPLASTIC FOAMED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/52] | MOVING WALKWAY WITH LAYER OF THERMOPLASTIC FOAMED MATERIAL | ||
[2010/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Habasit AG Römerstrasse 1 4153 Reinach / CH | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROHR, Stefan Rüteliweg 1 CH-4146 Hochwald / CH | 02 /
WRIGHT, Marshall Langer Zweig 6 CH-4244 Röschenz / CH | 03 /
LÜSCHER, Heinz Steinrebenstrasse 12 CH-4153 Reinach / CH | 04 /
OTTE, Frank Mangenharderstrasse 4 79400 Kandern / DE | 05 /
VON GELLHORN, Edgar Brunnenweid 2 CH-5643 Sins / CH | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Bohest AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | [2011/26] |
Former [2009/52] | Bohest AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 08714759.1 | 14.03.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008CH00109 | Priority number, date | CH20070000456 | 21.03.2007 Original published format: CH 4562007 | [2010/52] |
Former [2009/52] | CH20070045607 | 21.03.2007 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008113195 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134425 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2134425 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A63B22/02, B29D29/00, B65G15/34 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
A63B22/02 (EP,US);
B29D29/00 (EP,US);
B32B5/024 (US);
B32B5/24 (US);
A63B22/0285 (EP,US);
B32B2305/022 (US);
B32B2305/188 (US);
Y10T442/3325 (EP,US);
Y10T442/335 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3366 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | LAUFBAND MIT EINER SCHICHT AUS THERMOPLASTISCHEM SCHAUM | [2010/45] | English: | TREADMILL BELT WITH LAYER OF THERMOPLASTIC FOAMED MATERIAL | [2010/45] | French: | TAPIS ROULANT DOTÉ D'UNE COUCHE DE MOUSSE THERMOPLASTIQUE | [2009/52] |
Former [2009/52] | LAUFBAND MIT SCHICHT AUS THERMOPLASTISCHEM SCHAUM | ||
Former [2009/52] | MOVING WALKWAY WITH LAYER OF THERMOPLASTIC FOAMED MATERIAL | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 20.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2008 | CY | 29.06.2011 | CZ | 29.06.2011 | EE | 29.06.2011 | FI | 29.06.2011 | HR | 29.06.2011 | IE | 29.06.2011 | LT | 29.06.2011 | LV | 29.06.2011 | MT | 29.06.2011 | PL | 29.06.2011 | RO | 29.06.2011 | SI | 29.06.2011 | SK | 29.06.2011 | TR | 29.06.2011 | BG | 29.09.2011 | NO | 29.09.2011 | GR | 30.09.2011 | IS | 29.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | LU | 14.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
LU | 14.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 29.06.2011 | |
NO | 29.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0695827 (ALBANY INT CORP [US]) [A] 1-27 * page 5, line 49 - line 56 * * page 6, line 37 - page 7, line 26 * * page 7, line 56 - page 8, line 3 *; | [A]US5708060 (SAND MARK D [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 21 ** column 7, line 31 - line 44 *; | [AD]US5951441 (DALEBOUT WILLIAM T [US], et al) [AD] 1-27 * column 2, line 9 - line 34 * * column 3, line 47 - line 62 * * column 4, line 25 - line 59; figure 8 *; | [A]US2004132586 (LEIGHTON JAY PHILIP [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0039]; figure 4 * | by applicant | US5951441 | US2006287147 |