EP2126623 - EYEGLASSES AND EYEGLASS FRAMES COMPRISING GLYCOL MODIFIED COPOLYESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OKIA Optical Co., Ltd. Unit D, 5/F HongKong Spinners Industrial Building Phase 5, 760 Cheung Sha Wan Road Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states OKIA Optical Co. Ltd. Unit D, 5/F HongKong Spinners Industrial Building Phase 5, 760 Cheung Sha Wan Road Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAM, Yin, Sang Unit D, 5/F. HongKong Spinners Industrial Building Phase 5, 760 Cheung Sha Wan Road Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Yan Unit D, 5/F. HongKong Spinners Industrial Building Phase 5, 760 Cheung Sha Wan Road Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | [2014/20] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
LAM, Yin, Sang Unit D, 5/F. HongKong Spinners Industrial Building Phase 5, 760 Cheung Sha Wan Road Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Yan Unit D, 5/F. HongKong Spinners Industrial Building Phase 5, 760 Cheung Sha Wan Road Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Becker Kurig Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08714907.6 | 07.03.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008CN00454 | Priority number, date | US20070905591P | 08.03.2007 Original published format: US 905591 P | US20080026468 | 05.02.2008 Original published format: US 26468 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008106868 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2126623 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2126623 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02C5/00, G02C1/02, C08G63/40, G02C5/22, C08L67/02 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
G02C1/02 (EP,US);
G02C5/008 (EP,US);
G02C5/2218 (EP,US);
C08G63/199 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/49] | G02C5/00, G02C1/02, C08G63/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | BRILLEN UND BRILLENGESTELLE MIT GLYKOLMODIFIZIERTEN COPOLYESTERN | [2009/49] | English: | EYEGLASSES AND EYEGLASS FRAMES COMPRISING GLYCOL MODIFIED COPOLYESTERS | [2009/49] | French: | LUNETTES ET MONTURES DE LUNETTES COMPRENANT DES COPOLYESTERS MODIFIÉS PAR UN GLYCOL | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 13.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2013 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2008 | AT | 14.05.2014 | BE | 14.05.2014 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | CZ | 14.05.2014 | DK | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | ES | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | HR | 14.05.2014 | IT | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | MT | 14.05.2014 | NL | 14.05.2014 | PL | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | SE | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | TR | 14.05.2014 | NO | 14.08.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US5804617 (HOFFMAN DOUGLAS CLAIRE [US], et al); | [Y]CN2297741Y (LIN WENHUI [CN]); | [A]US5852164 (AKAI HIDEKO [JP], et al); | [Y]CN2372698Y (ZHOU JINQIAN [CN]); | [Y]JP2001172376 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [Y]WO03004561 (ENGINEERED PLASTICS CORP [US], et al); | [Y]CN1400485 (NIKON GLASSES K K [JP]); | [Y]US2006142524 (LAI YU-CHIN [US], et al) | by applicant | US5804617 | CN1400485 |