EP2131830 - PHARMACEUTICAL FORM WITH IMPEDED ABUSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grünenthal GmbH Zieglerstrasse 6 52078 Aachen / DE | [2009/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARKENAU-MARIC, Elisabeth Stadtwaldgürtel 50 50931 Köln / DE | 02 /
BARTHOLOMÄUS, Johannes Burghöhenweg 5 52080 Aachen / DE | 03 /
ZIEGLER, Iris P. Rosegger Strasse 14 86356 Neussäss / DE | 04 /
HAUPTS, Marcel Leuwstrasse 56 52224 Stolberg / DE | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Bülle, Jan, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/19] | Bülle, Jan, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Bülle, Jan, et al Kutzenberger & Wolff Patentanwaltssozietät Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 08716192.3 | 03.03.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008EP01672 | Priority number, date | DE20071011485 | 07.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007011485 | [2009/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008107149 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2131830 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2131830 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/137, A61K9/16, A61K9/48 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
A61K9/1635 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K9/1641 (EP,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
A61K9/4808 (EP,US);
A61K9/4866 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/19] |
Former [2009/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DARREICHUNGSFORM MIT ERSCHWERTEM MISSBRAUCH | [2009/51] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL FORM WITH IMPEDED ABUSE | [2009/51] | French: | FORME PHARMACEUTIQUE RENDANT L'USAGE ABUSIF PLUS DIFFICILE | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 26.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | FI | 10.05.2017 | HR | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | MT | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | SE | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | NO | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 10.05.2017 | |
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 10.05.2017 | |
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 10.05.2017 | |
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1138321 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-29 * insbesondere Absätze 34-49, Beispiele ** the whole document *; | [DX]DE10336400 (GRUENENTHAL GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102004032051 (GRUENENTHAL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102005005446 (GRUENENTHAL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-35 * the whole document * |