EP2115242 - PANEL FOR POURED CONCRETE RETAINING WALLS OF CONCRETE FORMS, PARTICULARLY FOR CONCRETE SLAB FORMS OR THE LIKE AND PROCESS OF MAKING SUCH PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROPLASTICA S.r.l. Via Gradisca 65/67 33087 Pasiano di Pordenone (PN) / IT | For all designated states ILPA Industria Legno Pasotti Srl Via Don Bartolomeo Giacomini 5/2 25075 Nave (BS) / IT | For all designated states ULMA C y E, S. COOP. Paseo Otadui, 3 Apdo.13 20560 Oñati (Gipuzkoa) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | For all designated states EUROPLASTICA S.r.l. Via Gradisca 65/67 33087 Pasiano di Pordenone (PN) / IT | ||
For all designated states ILPA Industria Legno Pasotti Srl Via Don Bartolomeo Giacomini 5/2 25075 Nave (BS) / IT | |||
For all designated states ULMA C y E, S. COOP. Paseo Otadui, 3 Apdo.13 20560 Onati (Gipuzkoa) / ES | |||
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states EUROPLASTICA S.r.l. Via Gradisca 65/67 33087 Pasiano di Pordenone (PN) / IT | ||
For all designated states Ilpa Industria Legno Pasotti Srl Via Fossato 35 25075 Nave (BS) / IT | |||
For all designated states ULMA C y E, S. COOP. Paseo Otadui, 3 Apdo.13 20560 Onati (Gipuzkoa) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINBACH, Paolo Salita Quarcino 15 22100 Como / IT | 02 /
PASOTTI, Rubens Via della Fonte 20 25075 Nave (BS) / IT | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Karaghiosoff, Giorgio Alessandro c/o Praxi Intellectual Property S.p.A. - Savona Via F. Baracca 1R, 4° piano "Il Gabbiano" 17100 Savona / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Karaghiosoff, Giorgio Alessandro Studio Karaghiosoff e Frizzi S.r.l. Via F. Baracca 1R 4° piano 17100 Savona / IT | Application number, filing date | 08716754.0 | 04.02.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008EP51343 | Priority number, date | IT2007SV00005 | 08.02.2007 Original published format: IT SV20070005 | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008095897 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2115242 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E04G9/05 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
E04G9/05 (EP);
E04G2009/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | PLATTE FÜR GUSSBETON-HALTEWÄNDE AUS BETONFORMEN, INSBESONDERE FÜR BETONPLATTENFORMEN ODER ÄHNLICHES UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SOLCHEN PLATTE | [2009/46] | English: | PANEL FOR POURED CONCRETE RETAINING WALLS OF CONCRETE FORMS, PARTICULARLY FOR CONCRETE SLAB FORMS OR THE LIKE AND PROCESS OF MAKING SUCH PANEL | [2009/46] | French: | PANNEAU POUR PAROIS DE COFFRAGE A BETON COULE DE FORMES EN BETON, EN PARTICULIER, POUR DES FORMES DE DALLE DE BETON OU ANALOGUES ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN TEL PANNEAU | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 01.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2305797 (KROGNER ANTON) [X] 1-33 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * figure - *; | [X]US3650795 (WILLINGHAM JOHN H) [X] 1-33 * claim 1 * * figure . *; | [X]DE20319285U (LAYHER W VERMOGENSVERW GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-33 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] * * figures 1,2 *; | [PX]CH696272 (WOODWELDING AG [CH]) [PX] 1,7,9,21-33 * figures 7,9 * * figure - * |