EP2118666 - METHOD FOR THE STANDARDIZATION OF THE CONCENTRATION OF ANALYTES IN A URINE SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mosaiques Diagnostics And Therapeutics AG Mellendorfer Str. 7-9 30625 Hannover / DE | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISCHAK, Harald Storchenstrasse 6 31319 Sehnde / DE | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte P.O. Box 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 08717477.7 | 06.03.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008EP52730 | Priority number, date | EP20070103684 | 07.03.2007 Original published format: EP 07103684 | [2009/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008107476 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2118666 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2118666 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/96 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
G01N33/6887 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (US);
G01N21/17 (US);
G01N21/6486 (US);
G01N30/72 (US);
G01N30/96 (US);
G01N33/96 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR NORMIERUNG DER KONZENTRATION VON ANALYTEN IN EINER URINPROBE | [2009/47] | English: | METHOD FOR THE STANDARDIZATION OF THE CONCENTRATION OF ANALYTES IN A URINE SAMPLE | [2009/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR NORMALISER LA CONCENTRATION D'ANALYTES DANS UN ÉCHANTILLON D'URINE | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2008 | CY | 03.08.2011 | CZ | 03.08.2011 | EE | 03.08.2011 | FI | 03.08.2011 | HR | 03.08.2011 | IE | 03.08.2011 | IT | 03.08.2011 | LT | 03.08.2011 | LV | 03.08.2011 | MT | 03.08.2011 | PL | 03.08.2011 | RO | 03.08.2011 | SE | 03.08.2011 | SI | 03.08.2011 | SK | 03.08.2011 | BG | 03.11.2011 | NO | 03.11.2011 | GR | 04.11.2011 | ES | 14.11.2011 | IS | 03.12.2011 | PT | 05.12.2011 | BE | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/35] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6818215 (SMITH JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 7,11* column 60, lines 64-67 *; | [Y]US2006024757 (HUSSA ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-10 * paragraph [1018] *; | [X] - KENT G N, "Standardization of marker assays--pyridinoline/deoxypyridinoline.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (1997), Database accession no. NLM9127470, XP002456785 [X] 1,9 * abstract * | [ ] - SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL AND LABORATORY INVESTIGATION. SUPPLEMENTUM 1997, (1997), vol. 227, ISSN 0085-591X, pages 73 - 79 | [Y] - SRINIVASAN V ET AL, "The DNA repair enzyme, CPD-photolyase restores the infectivity of UV-damaged fowlpox virus isolated from infected scabs of chickens", VETERINARY MICROBIOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050701), vol. 108, no. 3-4, ISSN 0378-1135, pages 215 - 223, XP004933322 [Y] 1-6,8-10 * page 218, paragraph 2.8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vetmic.2005.04.015 | Examination | - KENT G N, "Standardization of marker assays--pyridinoline/deoxypyridinoline.", SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL AND LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, (1997), vol. 227, ISSN 0085-591X, pages 73 - 79 | by applicant | WO2005024409 | WO2006106129 | - KENT ET AL., SCAND. J. CLIN. LAB. INVEST, (1997), vol. 7, no. 227, pages 73 - 29 |