EP2139815 - A METHOD OF PREPARATION OF AN AQUEOUS COMPOSITION OF ZIRCONIUM CARBONATE AND AN ALKALINE METAL SALT AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Archroma IP GmbH Neuhofstrasse 11 4153 Reinach / CH | [2016/13] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building Wickhams Cay P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TROUVE, Claude 170 rue Pelleport 75020 Paris / FR | [2010/13] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
TROUVE, Claude 40, rue d'Amiens F-60200 Compiegne / FR | Representative(s) | Ricker, Mathias, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/19] | Ricker, Mathias, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/49] | Ricker, Mathias, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Hütter, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 08717686.3 | 12.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008EP52940 | Priority number, date | FR20070054032 | 26.03.2007 Original published format: FR 0754032 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008116755 | Date: | 02.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139815 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139815 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C01G25/00, D21H19/12, D21H19/64, D21H21/20, D21H17/66 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
C01G25/00 (EP,KR,US);
C01G25/006 (EP,US);
D21H17/66 (EP,KR,US);
D21H19/12 (EP,KR,US);
D21H19/64 (EP,KR,US);
D21H21/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/19] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WÄSSRIGEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG VON ZIRCONIUMCARBONAT UND EINEM ALKALIMETALLSALZ UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2010/01] | English: | A METHOD OF PREPARATION OF AN AQUEOUS COMPOSITION OF ZIRCONIUM CARBONATE AND AN ALKALINE METAL SALT AND USE THEREOF | [2010/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE COMPOSITION AQUEUSE DE CARBONATE DE ZIRCONIUM ET D'UN SEL MÉTALLIQUE ALCALIN ET SON UTILISATION | [2017/47] |
Former [2010/01] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE COMPOSITION AQUEUSE DE CARBONATE DE ZIRCONIUM ET D'UN SEL MÉTALLIQUE ALCALIN ET LEUR UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 26.11.2014 | Observations by third parties | 23.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.05.2018 | DK | 09.05.2018 | EE | 09.05.2018 | HR | 09.05.2018 | LT | 09.05.2018 | LV | 09.05.2018 | MC | 09.05.2018 | RO | 09.05.2018 | SK | 09.05.2018 | BG | 09.08.2018 | NO | 09.08.2018 | GR | 10.08.2018 | IS | 09.09.2018 | PT | 10.09.2018 | [2021/31] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 09.05.2018 | |
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | HR | 09.05.2018 | |
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | HR | 09.05.2018 | |
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | HR | 09.05.2018 | |
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | LT | 09.05.2018 | |
NO | 09.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [DA]FR2088550 (BRITISH ALUMINIUM CO LTD) [DA] 1-17 * example VI *; | [DA]US4061720 (PHILLIPS RAYMOND FRANCIS) [DA] 1-17 * claim 4 * * column 2, lines 45-49 ** example 1 *; | [A]EP0004403 (ORGANON TEKNIKA BV [NL]) [A] 1-17 * claim 5 * * page 5, lines 16-31 * * example 4 * | Examination | GB1337983 | - Anne Veyland ET AL, "Aqueous Chemistry of Zirconium(IV) in Carbonate Media", Helvetica Chimica Acta, (20000216), vol. 83, no. 2, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1522-2675(20000216)83:2<414::AID-HLCA414>3.0.CO;2-2, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 414 - 427, XP055169361 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1522-2675(20000216)83:2<414::AID-HLCA414>3.0.CO;2-2 | other | - VEYLAND A. ET AL, "AQUEOUS CHEMISTRY OF ZIRCONIUM(IV) IN CARBONATE MEDIA", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (20000216), vol. 83, no. 2, pages 414 - 427, XP055169361 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1522-2675(20000216)83:2<414::AID-HLCA414>3.0.CO;2-2 |