EP2144595 - UV LIGHT-PROTECTIVE AGENT BASED ON MIXED INORGANIC-ORGANIC SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHMANN, Stephan Kropsburgstrasse 36 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
RIGGS, Richard Holzstrasse 7 68159 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
ANDRE, Valerie Brunckstrasse 19 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2010/03] | Application number, filing date | 08717790.3 | 13.03.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008EP53046 | Priority number, date | EP20070105661 | 04.04.2007 Original published format: EP 07105661 | [2010/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008122481 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2144595 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/49, A61K8/35, A61K8/29, A61Q17/04 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61K8/27 (EP,US);
A61K8/29 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/415 (EP,US);
A61K8/4966 (EP,US);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/413 (EP,US);
A61K2800/57 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | UV-LICHTSCHUTZMITTEL AUF BASIS VON ANORGANISCH-ORGANISCHEN MISCHSYSTEMEN | [2010/03] | English: | UV LIGHT-PROTECTIVE AGENT BASED ON MIXED INORGANIC-ORGANIC SYSTEMS | [2010/03] | French: | AGENT DE PROTECTION CONTRE LE RAYONNEMENT UV À BASE DE SYSTÈMES MIXTES MINÉRAUX-ORGANIQUES | [2010/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 04.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]EP0570838 (SIGMA PROD CHIM [IT]) [DY] 1-6 * claim - *; | [DY]EP0916335 (BASF AG [DE]) [DY] 1-6* claim - *; | [DXY]WO2007017587 (LVMH RECH [FR], et al) [DX] 1-3,6 * paragraphs [0036] - [0039] - [0085]; example -; claim - * [Y] 1-6 |