EP2137024 - COMPACT SEATING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: MT | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gordon Murray Design Limited Wharfside Broadford Park Shalford Surrey GU4 8EP / GB | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURRAY, Ian, Gordon Willow Cottage Cut Mill House Suffield Lane Puttenhamrd GU3 1BG / GB | [2015/18] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
MURRAY, Ian, Gordon Willow Cottage Cut Mill House Suffield Lane Puttenhamrd GU3 1BG / GB | Representative(s) | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Downing IP Limited Grosvenor House 7 Horseshoe Crescent Beaconsfield, Bucks. HP9 1LJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Downing, Michael Philip, et al Downing IP Oak House Oak End Way Gerrards Cross Buckinghamshire SL9 8BR / GB | ||
Former [2010/01] | Unwin, Stephen Geoffrey, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08718734.0 | 14.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008GB00892 | Priority number, date | GB20070004966 | 15.03.2007 Original published format: GB 0704966 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008110814 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2137024 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2137024 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/01 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B60N2/01 (EP,GB,US);
B60N2/36 (EP,GB,US);
B62D31/003 (EP,GB,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPAKTE SITZANORDNUNG | [2010/01] | English: | COMPACT SEATING ARRANGEMENT | [2010/01] | French: | DISPOSITION COMPACTE DE SIÈGES | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 16.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15162080.4 / EP2939868 | EP15162090.3 / EP2939869 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2008 | AT | 29.04.2015 | BE | 29.04.2015 | CY | 29.04.2015 | DK | 29.04.2015 | EE | 29.04.2015 | HR | 29.04.2015 | LT | 29.04.2015 | LV | 29.04.2015 | MC | 29.04.2015 | SE | 29.04.2015 | SI | 29.04.2015 | NO | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.07.2015 | IS | 29.08.2015 | PT | 31.08.2015 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.03.2008 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | HR | 29.04.2015 | |
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | HR | 29.04.2015 | |
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9218347 (MCLAREN CARS NV [GB]); | [Y]US5538309 (MURRAY GORDON [GB]); | [Y]DE29518853U (MOHR ERNST DIPL ING [CH]); | [E]US2009072572 (SCHEINBERG DAVID [US]) | by applicant | WO9218347 | US5538309 | DE29518853U |