EP2129362 - PERSONAL CARE PRODUCT COMPRISING CYCLODEXTRIN AS FRAGRANCE-COMPLEXING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2016/24] |
Former [2009/50] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBLANC, Michael, Jude 2216 Ravine Street Cincinnati, Ohio 45219 / US | 02 /
SANKER, Lowell, Alan 7609 Carriage Lane Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 03 /
SCAVONE, Timothy, Alan 2520 Ashwood Drive Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | 04 /
SWITZER, Adrian, Gregory 9049 Bedford Court Springboro, Ohio 45458 / US | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Sauvaître, Thibault Bruno Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Sauvaître, Thibault Bruno Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department PO Box 14 Frankfurter Straße 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2014/21] | Holmes, Rosalind Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Legal Innovation Patent Department Frankfurter Straße 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2013/22] | Holmes, Rosalind, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2013/13] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H., et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Wilding, Richard Alan, et al Procter & Gamble Patent Department Technical Centres Limited London Innovation Centre, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2011/10] | Hampton, Matthew John, et al Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2010/39] | Hampton, Matthew John Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2009/50] | Wilding, Richard Alan Procter & Gamble Technical Centre Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08719512.9 | 28.02.2008 | [2009/50] | WO2008IB50733 | Priority number, date | US20070712771 | 01.03.2007 Original published format: US 712771 | [2009/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008104954 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2129362 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2129362 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/73, A61K47/40, A61Q13/00, A61Q15/00, C11D3/50, A61K9/00, A61F13/15, A61K9/70, A61K47/48, C11D17/00 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
A61K47/40 (EP,US);
A61F13/15 (EP,US);
A61K8/738 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
C08B37/0015 (EP,US);
C08L5/16 (EP,US);
C11D17/006 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/24] |
Former [2009/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÖRPERPFLEGEPRODUKT MIT CYCLODEXTRIN ALS DUFTKOMPLEXBILDENDEM MATERIAL | [2009/50] | English: | PERSONAL CARE PRODUCT COMPRISING CYCLODEXTRIN AS FRAGRANCE-COMPLEXING MATERIAL | [2009/50] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET/OU ARTICLES COMPRENANT UNE MATIÈRE COMPLEXANT LA CYCLODEXTRINE | [2009/50] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.12.2015 | 15.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16168103.6 / EP3100714 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2008 | AT | 15.06.2016 | BE | 15.06.2016 | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | CZ | 15.06.2016 | DK | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | ES | 15.06.2016 | FI | 15.06.2016 | HR | 15.06.2016 | IT | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | NL | 15.06.2016 | PL | 15.06.2016 | RO | 15.06.2016 | SE | 15.06.2016 | SI | 15.06.2016 | SK | 15.06.2016 | TR | 15.06.2016 | NO | 15.09.2016 | GR | 16.09.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | PT | 17.10.2016 | CH | 28.02.2017 | IE | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | LU | 28.02.2017 | MT | 28.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.02.2008 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
MT | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 28.02.2008 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
MT | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.02.2008 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
MT | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
MT | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | |
NO | 15.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0076472 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 14 * page 1, lines 5-14 * * page 1, line 30 - page 3, line 9 * * page 3, lines 26-29 * * page 4, line 17 - page 10, line 35 * * page 16, lines 26-33; examples VII,VIII,IX,XI,XII * * page 23, line 7 *; | [X]EP1024785 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0149] - [0152] - [0172] , [0173]; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0392607 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-13 * examples 7,8; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0392608 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 3, line 39 - page 4, line 12 * * page 5, lines 24-55 * * page 7, line 41 - page 8, line 17 * * page 9, lines 12-39 * * page 11, line 44 - page 12, line 10; examples 3,5 *; | [X]US2003087776 (HELTOVICS GABOR [GB], et al) [X] 9-14 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0049] - [0060] - [0076] - [0079] - [0092] - [0097] - [0101] , [0102] , [0108] - [0111]; claim 12 *; | [X]EP0902679 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0068] , [0069]; example 3 * | by applicant | US6495149 |