EP2227686 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR ADIPOSE TISSUES DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Assaf, Antoine Via Montelungo 7 40065 Pianoro (BO) / IT | [2010/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/37] | Representative(s) | Natali, Dario Innova & Partners S.r.l. Via Cola di Rienzo 265 00192 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Natali, Dario Innova & Partners S.r.l. Via Cola di Rienzo 265 00192 Roma / ES | ||
Former [2011/47] | Natali, Dario Innova & Partners S.r.l. Caldeon de la Barca 10, 3[deg]C 03004 Alicante / ES | ||
Former [2011/26] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2010/37] | Maroscia, Antonio Contrà Porti, 21 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 08719524.4 | 29.02.2008 | [2010/37] | WO2008IB50747 | Priority number, date | IT2007VI00299 | 14.11.2007 Original published format: IT VI20070299 | [2010/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009063337 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2227686 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N22/00, A61B5/05 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
A61B5/05 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (EP,US);
A61B18/1815 (EP,US);
A61B5/0507 (EP,US);
A61B5/4872 (EP,US);
A61N5/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/37] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON FETTGEWEBEN | [2010/37] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR ADIPOSE TISSUES DETECTION | [2010/37] | French: | APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA DÉTECTION DE TISSUS ADIPEUX | [2010/37] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 17.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 09.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2011 | 28.02.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5144236 (STRENK LAWRENCE M [US]) [A] 1,6-14,16-18* column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 9; figure - *; | [A]US5841288 (MEANEY PAUL M [US], et al) [A] 1,6-14,16-18 * column 9, line 42 - column 10, line 54; figure - *; | [X]EP1834667 (MEDRAD INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0042]; figure - *; | [X] - GREGG E C ET AL, "A MICROWAVE SCANNER FOR SOFT TISSUE TUMOR DETECTION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, (19780828), vol. 152, ISSN 0277-786X, XP002040130 [X] 1,3-5,15 * page 104 - page 108 * |