EP2140464 - SUPERCONDUCTIVE MAGNET SYSTEM FOR A MAGNETIC RESONANCE EXAMINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2013/39] |
Former [2010/01] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIMINGER, Holger c/o High Tech Campus, Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 08719693.7 | 14.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008IB50945 | Priority number, date | EP20070104405 | 19.03.2007 Original published format: EP 07104405 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008114184 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2140464 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01F6/02 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
H01F6/02 (EP,US);
G01R33/3804 (EP,US);
G01R33/3806 (EP,US);
G01R33/3815 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | SUPRALEITENDES MAGNETSYSTEM FÜR EIN MAGNETRESONANZUNTERSUCHUNGSSYSTEM | [2010/01] | English: | SUPERCONDUCTIVE MAGNET SYSTEM FOR A MAGNETIC RESONANCE EXAMINATION SYSTEM | [2010/01] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AIMANT SUPRACONDUCTEUR POUR SYSTÈME D'EXAMEN PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/10] | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0350264 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [DA] 1-5* the whole document *; | [Y]DE10038119 (INST LUFT KAELTETECH GEM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4 * claim 1 *; | [XY]DE102004061869 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0013] , [0015] , [0034] , [0043]; figures 2,3; claims 1,22 * [Y] 4; | [XY]DE102005028414 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0030]; figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 4 | by applicant | EP0350264 | DE102004061869 |