EP2122668 - SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE SUITABLE FOR THE REALISATION OF ELECTRONIC AND/ OR OPTOELECTRONIC DEVICES AND RELATED MANUFACTURING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/48] | SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE SUITABLE FOR THE REALISATION OF ELECTRONIC AND/ OR OPTOELECTRONIC DEVICES AND RELATIVE MANUFACTURING PROCESS | ||
[2018/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consiglio Nazionale delle Ricerche P. le Aldo Moro, 7 00185 Roma / IT | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'ARRIGO, Giuseppe Alessio Maria CNR Istituto per la Microelettronica e Microsistemi (IMM) Stradale Primosole, 50 I-95121 Catania / IT | 02 /
LA VIA, Francesco CNR Istituto per la Microelettronica e Microsistemi (IMM) Stradale Primosole, 50 I-95121 Catania / IT | [2018/27] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
D'ARRIGO, Giuseppe Alessio Maria CNR Istituto per la Microelettronica e Microsistemi (IMM) Stradale Primosole, 50 I-95121 Catania / IT | ||
02 /
LA VIA, Francesco CNR Istituto per la Microelettronica e Microsistemi (IMM) Stradale Primosole, 50 I-95121 Catania / IT | Representative(s) | Ferrari, Barbara Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | Ferrari, Barbara Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/48] | Ferrari, Barbara Botti & Ferrari S.r.l., Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08720195.0 | 17.01.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008IT00025 | Priority number, date | IT2007MI00056 | 17.01.2007 Original published format: IT MI20070056 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008087686 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2122668 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2122668 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
H01L21/02502 (EP,US);
H01L21/02381 (EP,US);
H01L21/02439 (EP,US);
H01L21/0245 (EP,US);
H01L21/02513 (EP,US);
H01L21/02521 (EP,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/27] |
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HALBLEITERSUBSTRAT ZUR HERSTELLUNG ELEKTRONISCHER UND/ODER OPTOELEKTRONISCHER BAUELEMENTE UND ENTSPRECHENDES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2009/48] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE SUITABLE FOR THE REALISATION OF ELECTRONIC AND/ OR OPTOELECTRONIC DEVICES AND RELATED MANUFACTURING PROCESS | [2018/01] | French: | SUBSTRAT EN SEMI-CONDUCTEUR SE PRÊTANT À LA RÉALISATION DE DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES ET/OU OPTOÉLECTRONIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | [2009/48] |
Former [2009/48] | SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE SUITABLE FOR THE REALISATION OF ELECTRONIC AND/ OR OPTOELECTRONIC DEVICES AND RELATIVE MANUFACTURING PROCESS | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 04.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 25.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.01.2008 | AT | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | DK | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | ES | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | NL | 04.07.2018 | PL | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | NO | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | PT | 05.11.2018 | IE | 17.01.2019 | LU | 17.01.2019 | MT | 17.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 05.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
MT | 17.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 05.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
MT | 17.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 17.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | |
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 04.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005161702 (LINTHICUM KEVIN J [US], et al) [X] 1-10,17-34,41-56 * paragraphs [0017] , [0020] , [0030]; figure - *; | [X]US2005121693 (UDAGAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,17-34,41-56 * paragraphs [0029] , [0031] , [0048]; figures 1,2,5; claim 1 *; | [X]US2004232440 (OHTSUKA KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,17-34,41-56 * paragraphs [0030] - [0037]; figure - * | Examination | EP0969519 | - DALLA TORRE J ET AL, "Beyond the solid on solid model: An atomic dislocation formation mechanism", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (19981115), vol. 84, no. 10, doi:10.1063/1.368312, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 5487 - 5494, XP012045252 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.368312 | - ROMANOV S I ET AL, "GeSi films with reduced dislocation density grown by molecular-beam epitaxy on compliant substrates based on porous silicon", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, 2 HUNTINGTON QUADRANGLE, MELVILLE, NY 11747, (19991227), vol. 75, no. 26, doi:10.1063/1.125555, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 4118 - 4120, XP012024346 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.125555 | by applicant | US2111988 | US2005287770 | US7101774 | - "Characterization and fabrication of ZnSe epilayer on porous silicon substrate", THIN SOLID FILMS, (2000), vol. 379, pages 287 - 291 | - S. SARAVANAN ET AL., "Growth and characterization of GaAs epitaxial layer on Si/porous Si/Si substrate by chemical beam epitaxy", J. APPL. PHYS., (2001), vol. 89, pages 5215 - 5219 | - YASUHIKO HAYASHI ET AL., "Thermal Stress Relaxation in GaAs layer on New thin Si layer over Porous Si Substrate Grown by metalorganic chemical vapor deposition", JPN. J. APPL. PHYS., (1998), vol. 37, pages L 1354 - L1357 | - S.I. ROMANOV ET AL., "GeSi Films With Reduced Dislocation Density Grown by Molecular-Beam Epitaxy on Compliant Substrate Based on Porous Silicon", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS |