EP2251666 - METHOD FOR EVALUATING CHARACTERISTICS OF OPTICAL MODULATOR HAVING HIGH-PRECISION MACH-ZEHNDER INTERFEROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Information and Communications Technology 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP | [2018/41] |
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states National Institute of Information and Communication Technology 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWANISHI, Tetsuya c/o Intellectual Property Management Group National Institute of Information and CommunicationsTechnology 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP | 02 /
NAKAJIMA, Shinya c/o Intellectual Property Management Group National Institute of Information and Communications Technology 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP | 03 /
SHINADA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Management Group National Institute of Information and Communications Technology 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/46] | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08720369.1 | 07.03.2008 | [2010/46] | WO2008JP00483 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009110039 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251666 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01M11/00, G02F1/035 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
G02F1/225 (EP,US);
G02F1/212 (EP,US);
G02F2201/18 (EP,US);
G02F2203/69 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EVALUIERUNG VON EIGENSCHAFTEN EINES OPTISCHEN MODULATORS MIT EINEM HOCHPRÄZISEN MACH-ZEHNDER-INTERFEROMETER | [2010/46] | English: | METHOD FOR EVALUATING CHARACTERISTICS OF OPTICAL MODULATOR HAVING HIGH-PRECISION MACH-ZEHNDER INTERFEROMETER | [2010/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES D'UN MODULATEUR OPTIQUE À INTERFÉROMÈTRE DE MACH-ZEHNDER HAUTE PRÉCISION | [2010/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2010 | Translation filed | 07.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 05.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007292142 (HASHIMOTO YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0060] *; | [A]JPH04290940 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A] - KAWANISHI T ET AL, "Duobinary signal generation using high-extinction ratio modulation", OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION/NATIONAL FIBER OPTIC ENGINEERS CONFERENCE, 2008. OFC/NFOEC 2008. CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080224), ISBN 978-1-55752-856-8, pages 1 - 3, XP031391834 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2005091532 (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JPH04290940 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPH03123828 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2004077835 (COMM RES LAB); | [A]JP2006064868 (NAT INST INF & COMM TECH); | [A]JP2002277091 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JP2003139653 (TELECOMM ADVANCEMENT ORG JAPAN, et al); | [A]WO2007088636 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP3538619B | JP3866082B |