EP2120524 - COOLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBATA Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
YASUI Nobuyuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMOTO Mutsuhiko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
SINZAKI Kouji c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
YAMAGUCHI Toshikazu c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
FUNADA Naoyuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 07 /
TUZI Keisuke c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 08 /
SAHASI Takahiro c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 09 /
OUSAKA Satoshi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 10 /
HAGIMOTO Keisuke c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2011/41] |
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
SHIBATA Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
YASUI Nobuyuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUMOTO Mutsuhiko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
04 /
SINZAKI Kouji c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
05 /
YAMAGUCHI Toshikazu c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
06 /
FUNADA Naoyuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
07 /
TUZI Keisuke c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
08 /
SAHASI Takahiro c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
09 /
OUSAKA Satoshi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
10 /
HAGIMOTO Keisuke c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08720424.4 | 12.03.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008JP00538 | Priority number, date | JP20070063182 | 13.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007063182 | [2009/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008111310 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2120524 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2120524 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, F25D1/00 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
F24F12/006 (EP,US);
F24F13/20 (EP,US);
H05K7/206 (EP,US);
F24F2013/207 (EP,US);
Y02B30/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | KÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2009/47] | English: | COOLING DEVICE | [2009/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2009 | Translation filed | 11.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 10.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2008 | AT | 12.10.2011 | BE | 12.10.2011 | CY | 12.10.2011 | CZ | 12.10.2011 | EE | 12.10.2011 | FI | 12.10.2011 | HR | 12.10.2011 | IT | 12.10.2011 | LT | 12.10.2011 | LV | 12.10.2011 | MT | 12.10.2011 | NL | 12.10.2011 | PL | 12.10.2011 | RO | 12.10.2011 | SI | 12.10.2011 | SK | 12.10.2011 | TR | 12.10.2011 | BG | 12.01.2012 | NO | 12.01.2012 | GR | 13.01.2012 | ES | 23.01.2012 | IS | 12.02.2012 | PT | 13.02.2012 | GB | 12.03.2012 | IE | 12.03.2012 | LU | 12.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | FR | 02.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
TR | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
LU | 12.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
TR | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
GB | 12.03.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 12.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
NO | 12.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP2007116118 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [AP] 1-10 * abstract ** figures 1-16 * | International search | [A]JPH102696 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-10* , Par. No. [0019]; Figs. 2, 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH10190270 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-10 * , Par. No. [0021]; Fig. 1 & US 6026891 A & DE 19723955 A & AU 695962 B & BR 9703541 A & KR 10-259598 B & CN 1177094 A *; | [A]JPH10227554 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-10 * , Par. Nos. [0021], [0050]; Figs. 1, 2 & US 6039111 A * | by applicant | JPH058253 |