EP2116909 - DEVELOPMENT APPARATUS AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZAKI, Soichi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
IKUMA, Ken c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/46] | Siegert, Georg Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08720850.0 | 26.02.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008JP53262 | Priority number, date | JP20070052046 | 01.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007052046 | JP20070305135 | 26.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007305135 | [2009/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008105396 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2116909 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08, G03G9/08 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
G03G15/0818 (EP,US);
G03G9/0806 (EP,US);
G03G9/08755 (EP,US);
G03G9/08773 (EP,US);
G03G9/08793 (EP,US);
G03G9/09725 (EP,US);
G03G9/09766 (EP,US);
G03G9/09775 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0614 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0861 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | ENTWICKLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/46] | English: | DEVELOPMENT APPARATUS AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS | [2009/46] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉVELOPPEMENT ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGE | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2009 | Translation filed | 02.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 10.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5502552 (IWATA NAOKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-3,6,8,9,13 * column 2, lines 13-23 * * column 5, lines 27-62 * * column 6, lines 13-18; figures 1-8, 9A, 9B *; | [X]EP1513026 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,13 * page 2, lines 51-58 * * page 18, line 14 - page 19, line 93 * * page 32, lines 1-29; figures 1-6 * | International search | [Y]JP2003208012 (RICOH KK); | [Y]JP2006259384 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2001166527 (OKI DATA KK); | [Y]JP2006163302 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003263020 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2003195554 (RICOH KK); | [Y]JPH10111582 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2004286824 (RICOH KK); | [Y]JPH0915900 (KAO CORP) | by applicant | JP2007052046 | JP2007305135 | JP2001166527 |