EP2130936 - SOFT MAGNETIC RIBBON, MAGNETIC CORE, MAGNETIC PART AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SOFT MAGNETIC RIBBON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8614 / JP | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHTA, Motoki c/o Advanced Electronics Research Laboratory HITACHI METALS LTD. 5200 Mikajiri Kumagaya-shi Saitama 360-0843 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIZAWA, Yoshihito c/o Advanced Electronics Research Laboratory HITACHI METALS LTD. 5200 Mikajiri Kumagaya-shi Saitama 360-0843 / JP | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2009/50] | Application number, filing date | 08721218.9 | 04.03.2008 | [2009/50] | WO2008JP53798 | Priority number, date | JP20070074974 | 22.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007074974 | JP20070074976 | 22.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007074976 | [2009/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008114605 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2130936 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C21D6/00, C22C45/02, H01F1/153, H01F3/04, H01F10/13, H01F41/02, H01F41/24, C21D8/12, C22C33/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/12, C22C38/16 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
C22C38/12 (EP,US);
H01F1/153 (KR);
C21D6/00 (KR);
C21D8/1211 (EP,US);
C21D8/1272 (EP,US);
C22C33/003 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/16 (EP,US);
C22C45/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01F1/15308 (EP,US);
H01F1/15333 (EP,US);
H01F3/04 (EP,KR,US);
H01F41/0226 (EP,US);
C21D2201/03 (EP,US);
C21D2201/05 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/50] | C22C38/00, C21D6/00, C22C45/02, H01F1/153, H01F3/04, H01F10/13, H01F41/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | WEICHMAGNETISCHES BAND, MAGNETKERN, MAGNETISCHES TEIL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WEICHMAGNETISCHEN BANDS | [2009/50] | English: | SOFT MAGNETIC RIBBON, MAGNETIC CORE, MAGNETIC PART AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SOFT MAGNETIC RIBBON | [2009/50] | French: | RUBAN MAGNÉTIQUE DOUX, NOYAU MAGNÉTIQUE, PIÈCE MAGNÉTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE RUBAN MAGNÉTIQUE DOUX | [2009/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2009 | Translation filed | 19.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 26.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/45] | 06.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5211767 (SHIGETA MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 4, lines 43-60 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 64 * * claims 1-17 * * figures 1,5 * * table 1 *; | [X]US6425960 (YOSHIZAWA YOSHIHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 5, lines 18-34 * * tables 2-5 * * claims 1-23 *; | EP1045402 [ ] (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]); | [XP]WO2007032531 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 1-14 * tables 1-3,5,6,8,9,12-14 *; | EP1925686 [ ] (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0041] - [0065] * * claims 1-16 * | International search | [A]JPH0617204 (TDK CORP); | [A]JP2002075718 (HITACHI METALS LTD); | [XP]JP2007270271 (HITACHI METALS LTD); | [XP]WO2007032531 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH05140703 | JPH01156451 | JP2006040906 |