EP2119430 - PEARLESCENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSOYA, Shingo c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 02 /
SAKUMA, Yasumitsu c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 03 /
MINE, Koji c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 04 /
NAKAI, T. c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08721777.4 | 11.03.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008JP54361 | Priority number, date | JP20070062581 | 12.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007062581 | JP20070156791 | 13.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007156791 | [2009/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008126558 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119430 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/37, A61K8/06, A61K8/36, A61K8/39, A61K8/42, A61K8/46, A61Q5/02, A61Q5/12, A61Q19/00, C11D1/72, C11D3/20, C11D3/32, C11D3/42 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
A61Q5/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/37 (KR);
A61K8/33 (EP,US);
A61K8/342 (EP,US);
A61K8/361 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/46 (KR);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,KR,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US);
C11D3/0089 (EP,US);
C11D3/2006 (EP,US);
C11D3/2068 (EP,US);
C11D3/2075 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | PERLENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2009/47] | English: | PEARLESCENT COMPOSITION | [2009/47] | French: | COMPOSITION PERLÉE | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2009 | Translation filed | 09.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 25.04.2013 | Observations by third parties | 24.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 24.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0332805 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * examples 1-4,9; claim 1G *; | [X]DE3724547 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-9 * examples 24-28 *; | [X]DE19754842 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9 * examples 3,5; claim 1 *; | [X]USRE38141E (BROWN JAMES H [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * example 1 * | International search | [A]JP2005513071 ; | [A]JPH10510541 ; | [A]JPH11503109 ; | [A]JP2004196806 (OREAL); | [A]JP2003146853 (KAWAKEN FINE CHEMICALS CO); | [A]JP2000178117 (KAO CORP) | other | WO9850006 | EP1739095 | EP1862160 | EP1859780 | EP0332805 |