EP2128178 - RESIN COMPOSITION FOR OPTICAL MEMBER AND OPTICAL MEMBER OBTAINED FROM THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Revocation of patent | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. Mitsubishi Building 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEUCHI, Motoharu c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Research Laboratory 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | 02 /
HORIKOSHI, Hiroshi c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Research Laboratory 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Hiroaki c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Research Laboratory 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | 04 /
ISHIZUKA, Hirohito c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Research Laboratory 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | [2013/17] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
TAKEUCHI, Motoharu c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Research Laboratory 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | ||
02 /
HORIKOSHI, Hiroshi c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Research Laboratory 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | |||
03 /
TANAKA, Hiroaki c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Research Laboratory 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | |||
04 /
ISHIZUKA, Hirohito c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Research Laboratory 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/49] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08722241.0 | 11.03.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008JP54845 | Priority number, date | JP20070068321 | 16.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007068321 | JP20070101443 | 09.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007101443 | JP20070218439 | 24.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007218439 | JP20070222283 | 29.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007222283 | JP20070225923 | 31.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007225923 | JP20070239091 | 14.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007239091 | JP20080027592 | 07.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008027592 | [2009/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008114765 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128178 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2128178 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08F20/38, G02B1/04 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
C08F212/30 (EP,US);
C08F20/38 (KR);
C08F12/30 (US);
C08F212/36 (EP,US);
C08F216/1475 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/382 (EP,KR,US);
C08G75/08 (EP,US);
C08L33/14 (KR);
G02B1/04 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
G02B1/04, C08L81/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EIN OPTISCHES ELEMENT UND DARAUS GEWONNENES OPTISCHES ELEMENT | [2009/49] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION FOR OPTICAL MEMBER AND OPTICAL MEMBER OBTAINED FROM THE SAME | [2009/49] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE POUR ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE ET ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE OBTENU À PARTIR DE CE DERNIER | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2009 | Translation filed | 17.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 16.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP11193589.6 / EP2463318 | EP14155308.1 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 17.02.2014 | EP14177288.9 / EP2799455 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE PPG Indudtries, Inc One PPG Place Pittsburgh PA 15272 / US Opponent's representative f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE PPG Indudtries, Inc One PPG Place Pittsburgh PA 15272 / US Opponent's representative f & e patent Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03.03.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.07.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.09.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.11.2016 | 12.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 22.09.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/06] | 14.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2008 | AT | 24.04.2013 | BE | 24.04.2013 | CY | 24.04.2013 | CZ | 24.04.2013 | DK | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | FI | 24.04.2013 | HR | 24.04.2013 | IT | 24.04.2013 | LT | 24.04.2013 | LV | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | MT | 24.04.2013 | NL | 24.04.2013 | PL | 24.04.2013 | RO | 24.04.2013 | SE | 24.04.2013 | SI | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | TR | 24.04.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | NO | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | ES | 04.08.2013 | IS | 24.08.2013 | PT | 26.08.2013 | IE | 11.03.2014 | LU | 11.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.03.2008 | |
AT | 24.04.2013 | ||
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
MT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
MT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2014 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
LU | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4315067 (GAZARD MARYSE, et al) [X] 1-2,4-9,14-18 * example -; claim - *[I] 1-18; | [XI]US4414081 (ERANIAN ARMAND [FR], et al) [X] 1-2,4-9,14-18 * example -; claim - * [I] 1-18; | [XI]FR2630744 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [X] 1-2,4-9,14-18 * example -; claim - * [I] 1-18 | International search | [A]JPS5759920 (EGAWA HIROAKI); | [X]FR2630744 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]JPH04288306 (TOKUYAMA SODA KK); | [A]JP2005225799 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2006233039 (UNIV KANAGAWA, et al) | by applicant | JPH0415249 | JPH0458489 | JPH05215903 | JPH05307102 | JPH05307103 | JPH07292043 | JPH08271702 | JPH09110955 | JPH09110956 | JPH11318960 | JP3465528B | JP3491660B | JP3541707B | JP3663861B | JP3738817B | - MONTHLY REPORT OF JAPAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, (198708), pages 27 - 31 | - MONTHLY REPORT OF JAPAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, (199402), pages 8 - 11 |