EP2043157 - SCHOTTKY BARRIER DIODE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAZAKI, Tomihito c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 02 /
KIYAMA, Makoto c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08722464.8 | 19.03.2008 | [2009/14] | WO2008JP55089 | Priority number, date | JP20070078275 | 26.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007078275 | [2009/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008117718 | Date: | 02.10.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2043157 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/872, H01L21/329 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
H01L29/872 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/47 (KR);
H01L29/66143 (EP,US);
H01L29/66204 (EP,US);
H01L29/2003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/14] | H01L29/47, H01L29/872 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2010/18] |
Former [2009/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHOTTKY-BARRIERENDIODE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/14] | English: | SCHOTTKY BARRIER DIODE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2009/14] | French: | DIODE À BARRIÈRE SCHOTTKY ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2008 | Translation filed | 26.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 27.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/25] | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5712565 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]US6362495 (SCHOEN KIPP J [US], et al) [X] 4,6 * page 4, line 49 - page 5, line 19; figures 5A-5E *; | [AD]WO03094240 (ADVANCED TECH MATERIALS [US], et al) [AD] 1-8* the whole document *; | [X]EP1564801 (EMCORE CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]US2007023781 (MIZUKAMI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 7,8 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0065]; figures 2A-4C *; | [X] - LEE CHING-TING ET AL, "Schottky barrier height and surface state density of Ni/Au contacts to (NH4)2Sx-treated n-type GaN", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20011015), vol. 79, no. 16, doi:10.1063/1.1410358, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 2573 - 2575, XP012029152 [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1410358 | [A] - MOHAMMAD S N ET AL, "Near-ideal platinum-GaN Schottky diodes", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19960314), vol. 32, no. 6, doi:10.1049/EL:19960354, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 598 - 599, XP006004867 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19960354 | International search | [X]JPS4827504B ; | [X]JPS4822390B ; | [X]JPS4517247B ; | [X]JPS4813273B | Examination | EP1633003 | by applicant | JP2005530334 |