EP2179278 - ELECTROCHEMICAL BIOSENSOR MEASURING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, PT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states i-Sens, Inc. 465-14 Wolgye-4-dong Nowon-gu Seoul 139-845 / KR | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUI, Gang 201-508 Hanil2cha Apt. Wolgye-dong Nowon-gu Seoul 139-050 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Keun Ki 306-404 Jugong 3danji Apt. 347 Chang-1dong Dobong-gu Seoul 132-781 / KR | 03 /
HAN, Dong Hoon 1007-1106 Sinnae 10danji Sinnae Apt. Sinnae-2dong Jungnang-gu Seoul 131-790 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Moon Hwan 302 134-19 Jegi-2dong Dongdaemun-gu Seoul 130-062 / KR | 05 /
NAM, Hakhyun 101-206 Hanyang Apt. 133-1 Beon-3dong Gangbuk-gu Seoul 142-063 / KR | 06 /
CHA, Geun Sig 9-78 Hongeun-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-841 / KR | [2015/01] |
Former [2010/17] | 01 /
CUI, Gang 201-508 Hanil2cha Apt. Wolgye-dong Nowon-gu Seoul 139-050 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Keun Ki 306-404 Jugong 3danji Apt. 347 Chang-1dong Dobong-gu Seoul 132-781 / KR | |||
03 /
HAN, Dong Hoon 1007-1106 Sinnae 10danji Sinnae Apt. Sinnae-2dong Jungnang-gu Seoul 131-790 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Moon Hwan 302 134-19 Jegi-2dong Dongdaemun-gu Seoul 130-062 / KR | |||
05 /
NAM, Hakhyun 101-206 Hanyang Apt. 133-1 Beon-3dong Gangbuk-gu Seoul 142-063 / KR | |||
06 /
CHA, Geun Sig 9-78 Hongeun-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-841 / KR | Representative(s) | Koepe, Gerd L. Koepe & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | Koepe, Gerd L. Koepe & Partner Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/17] | Koepe, Gerd L. Koepe & Partner Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08723144.5 | 26.02.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008KR01106 | Priority number, date | KR20070080588 | 10.08.2007 Original published format: KR 20070080588 | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009022779 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2179278 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2179278 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487, C12Q1/00, // A61B5/145, A61B5/1486 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
G01N33/48771 (EP,US);
G01N27/72 (KR);
C12Q1/004 (EP,US);
G01N33/48 (KR);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/1486 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/51] | G01N33/487, // G01N35/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/17] | G01N27/72 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHES BIOSENSORMESSSYSTEM | [2010/17] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL BIOSENSOR MEASURING SYSTEM | [2010/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MESURE DE BIOCAPTEUR ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 06.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2008 | AT | 31.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | BG | 31.12.2014 | CY | 31.12.2014 | CZ | 31.12.2014 | DK | 31.12.2014 | EE | 31.12.2014 | ES | 31.12.2014 | FI | 31.12.2014 | HR | 31.12.2014 | IT | 31.12.2014 | LT | 31.12.2014 | LV | 31.12.2014 | MC | 31.12.2014 | MT | 31.12.2014 | NL | 31.12.2014 | PL | 31.12.2014 | RO | 31.12.2014 | SE | 31.12.2014 | SI | 31.12.2014 | SK | 31.12.2014 | TR | 31.12.2014 | IE | 26.02.2015 | LU | 26.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | FR | 02.03.2015 | GB | 31.03.2015 | NO | 31.03.2015 | GR | 01.04.2015 | IS | 30.04.2015 | PT | 01.05.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
GB | 31.03.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
GB | 31.03.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
GB | 31.03.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
GB | 31.03.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 31.12.2014 | |
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 31.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2007050396 (HOME DIAGNOSTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0097] - [0099] * * paragraphs [0110] - [0113] * * paragraph [0139] * [Y] 4-8 [I] 2,3; | [Y]JPH02216057 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH) [Y] 4-8 * abstract *; | [AD]US6814844 (BHULLAR RAGHBIR S [US], et al) [AD] 1-8 * abstract * * column 10, lines 7-37 * | International search | [Y]US6814844 (BHULLAR RAGHBIR S [US], et al); | [Y]US2005089449 (POLWART STUART [GB], et al); | [A]JPH11304748 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [A]JP2001147230 (HITACHI SOFTWARE ENG); | [A]KR20060089464 (I SENS INC [KR]) |