EP2257241 - AN APPARATUS FOR MITRAL LIFTING ANNULOPLATY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sciencity Co., Ltd. 3-Dong, Wonju Medical Instrument Industry Park 1720-26 Taejang-Dong Wonju-Shi, Kangwon-Do 220-120 / KR | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Meong-Gun 11-1201 Walker Hill Apt. Gwangjang-dong Gwangjin-gu Seoul 143-752 / KR | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08723479.5 | 14.03.2008 | [2010/49] | WO2008KR01442 | Priority number, date | KR20080023311 | 13.03.2008 Original published format: KR 20080023311 | [2010/49] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009113748 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2257241 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
A61F2/2445 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/04 (KR);
A61L27/14 (KR);
A61B2017/00783 (KR);
A61F2250/0029 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | GERÄT FÜR MITRALKLAPPEN-HEBE-ANNULOPLASTIE | [2010/49] | English: | AN APPARATUS FOR MITRAL LIFTING ANNULOPLATY | [2010/49] | French: | APPAREIL D'ANNULOPLASTIE MITRALE | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2008 | Translation filed | 12.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 02.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2014 | 31.03.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004084770 (SCIENCITY CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 5, line 22 - page 9, line 17; figures 1A-1C *; | [XI]US2006100697 (CASANOVA R M [US]) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0028] - [0041]; figures 1,5C,5D * [I] 2,4; | [XI]EP1719476 (SORIN BIOMEDICA CARDIO SRL [IT]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0029] - [0032]; figures 8,13 *[I] 4 | International search | [A]WO0119292 (CARDIAC CONCEPTS INC [US], et al); | [A]US6368348 (GABBAY SHLOMO [US]); | [A]WO03041617 (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US]); | [A]US6908482 (MCCARTHY PATRICK M [US], et al); | [A]US2007191939 (RYAN TIM [US], et al) |