EP2132949 - SELECTION OF AN UPLINK CARRIER FREQUENCY CORRESPONDING TO ONE OF CO-SITED CELLS HAVING DIFFERENT COVERAGE AREAS AND SUPPORTING DIFFERENT UPLINK DATA RATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2016/30] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUNNARSSON, Fredrik Tinnerbäcksgränd 28 S-587 50 Linköping / SE | 02 /
HAGERMAN, Bo Hästhagsvägen 7 S-135 52 Tyresö / SE | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2016/30] |
Former [2009/51] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 08724251.7 | 18.03.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008SE50304 | Priority number, date | US20070730575 | 02.04.2007 Original published format: US 730575 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008121053 | Date: | 09.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2132949 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2132949 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, // H04W16/08, H04W28/22 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
H04W72/52 (EP,US);
H04W16/08 (EP,US);
H04W28/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/52] | H04W16/00, H04W4/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/51] | H04Q7/36, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/30] |
Former [2009/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUSWAHL EINER UPLINK-TRÄGERFREQUENZ ENTSPRECHEND EINEM VON MEHREREN BENACHBARTEN ENDGERÄTEN MIT VERSCHIEDENEN ABDECKUNGSBEREICHEN UND UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN UPLINK-DATENRATEN | [2009/51] | English: | SELECTION OF AN UPLINK CARRIER FREQUENCY CORRESPONDING TO ONE OF CO-SITED CELLS HAVING DIFFERENT COVERAGE AREAS AND SUPPORTING DIFFERENT UPLINK DATA RATES | [2009/51] | French: | SÉLECTION D'UNE FRÉQUENCE DE PORTEUSE DE LIAISON MONTANTE CORRESPONDANT À UNE DES CELLULES CO-SITUÉES AYANT DES ZONES DE COUVERTURE DIFFÉRENTES ET PRENANT EN CHARGE DIFFÉRENTS DÉBITS DE DONNÉES DE LIAISON MONTANTE | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 06.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 21.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2008 | AT | 27.07.2016 | BE | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | DK | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | ES | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | IT | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | NL | 27.07.2016 | PL | 27.07.2016 | RO | 27.07.2016 | SE | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | TR | 27.07.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | PT | 28.11.2016 | IE | 18.03.2017 | LU | 18.03.2017 | MT | 18.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.03.2008 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 18.03.2017 | ||
LU | 18.03.2017 | ||
MT | 18.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.03.2008 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 18.03.2017 | ||
LU | 18.03.2017 | ||
MT | 18.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 18.03.2017 | ||
LU | 18.03.2017 | ||
MT | 18.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 18.03.2017 | ||
LU | 18.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
LU | 18.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9856207 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - line 21 * * page 3, line 12 - line 27 * * page 7, line 1 - line 15 * * page 9, line 16 - page 15, line 23 *; | [I]US2001031638 (KORPELA SARI [FI], et al) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0052] *; | [IA]US2004162074 (CHEN REX HUAN-YUEH [TW]) [I] 1,9,15,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0044] * [A] 2-8,10-14; | [IA]WO2005101886 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [I] 1,9,15,16 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph second * * page 2, paragraph first * * page 3, paragraph last * * page 5, paragraph last - page 7, paragraph second * [A] 2-8,10-14; | [A]WO2006014092 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraphs [0099] , [ 101] , [ 107] , [ 131] , [ 137] *; | [XP]EP1771024 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [XP] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0086] ** figures 4-6 * | International search | [X]US5357599 (LUKEN WILLIAM L [US]); | [X]WO9852374 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); | [X]EP1022920 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [X]WO2005114920 (KINETO WIRELESS INC [US], et al); | [X]US2006209882 (HAN SEUNG-JAE [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9856207 | US2001031638 | US2004162074 | WO2005101886 |