EP2104649 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ENHANCING AN ACTIVATED SLUDGE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evoqua Water Technologies LLC 210 Sixth Avenue, Suite 3300 Pittsburgh, PA 15222 / US | [2017/48] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Evoqua Water Technologies LLC 181 Thorn Hill Road Warrendale PA 15086 / US | ||
Former [2014/21] | For all designated states Evoqua Water Technologies LLC 4800 North Point Parkway, Suite 250 Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | ||
Former [2014/10] | For all designated states Siemens Water Technologies LLC 4800 North Point Parkway Suite 250 Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | ||
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Siemens Industry, Inc. 3333 Old Milton Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US | ||
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states Cambridge Water Technology, Inc. 810 Memorial Drive 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARSTON, Peter, G. 7 Leslie Road Ipswich, MA 01938 / US | 02 /
WOODARD, Steven 17 Homestead Lane Cumberland, ME 04021 / US | 03 /
WECHSLER, Ionel 10 Royce Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/38] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2014/15] | Fyfe, Fiona Allison Watson Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2012/21] | Payne, Janice Julia, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/40] | Jones, Graham Henry Graham Jones & Company Blackheath 77 Beaconsfield Road London SE3 7LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 08724459.6 | 09.01.2008 | [2009/40] | WO2008US00323 | Priority number, date | US20070879373P | 09.01.2007 Original published format: US 879373 P | US20070994553P | 20.09.2007 Original published format: US 994553 P | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008086010 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2104649 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2104649 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/00, // C02F3/12 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
C02F3/12 (EP,US);
C02F1/5236 (EP,US);
C02F1/56 (EP,US);
C02F2305/12 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/40] | C02F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/38] |
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG EINES AKTIVIERTEN SCHLAMMVERFAHRENS | [2009/40] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ENHANCING AN ACTIVATED SLUDGE PROCESS | [2009/40] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR AMÉLIORER UN TRAITEMENT PAR BOUES ACTIVÉES | [2009/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 19.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2008 | AT | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | DK | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | IT | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | NL | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | SE | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | NO | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IE | 09.01.2019 | LU | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3977966 (PRADT LOUIS A, et al) [X] 1,10,11,16 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 45; figures 1,2 * [I] 2-9,12-15; | [A]EP0383674 (OMNIUM TRAITEMENT VALORISA [FR]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [XI]FR2719235 (OMNIUM TRAITEMENT VALORISA [FR]) [X] 1,10,11,16 * page 10, line 12 - line 15; figure . * [I] 2-9,12-15; | [XI]JPH08257583 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [X] 1,10,11,16 * abstract * [I] 2-9,12-15; | [A]WO9803433 (OMNIUM TRAITEMENT VALORISA [FR], et al) [A] 1-16* figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]US5266200 (REID JOHN H [US]); | [Y]US5395527 (DESJARDINS GAETAN [CA]); | [Y]US6099738 (WECHSLER IONEL [US], et al); | [Y]US6960294 (ARNAUD JOHNNY [US]) | Examination | FR2787781 |