EP2121057 - POLYMERIZATION WITH PRECIPITATION OF PROTEINS FOR ELUTION IN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INCEPT LLC 6 Porter Lane Lexington MA 02420 / US | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAWHNEY, Amarpreet, S. 6 Porter Lane Lexington, MA 02420 / US | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 Deichmannhaus am Dom 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 08725234.2 | 06.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008US01577 | Priority number, date | US20070899898P | 06.02.2007 Original published format: US 899898 P | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008097581 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2121057 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/14, C08J3/075, C08J3/24, A61K39/395, A61K47/34, A61K31/337, A61K31/355, A61K38/18, A61K38/36, A61K9/00, A61K9/06 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K38/1841 (EP,US);
A61K38/1875 (EP,US);
A61K38/363 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | A61L27/14, C08J3/075, C08J3/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | POLYMERISIERUNG MIT AUSSCHEIDUNG VON PROTEINEN ZUR AUFLÖSUNG IN EINER PHYSIOLOGISCHEN LÖSUNG | [2009/48] | English: | POLYMERIZATION WITH PRECIPITATION OF PROTEINS FOR ELUTION IN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOLUTION | [2009/48] | French: | POLYMÉRISATION AVEC PRÉCIPITATION DE PROTÉINES POUR ÉLUTION DANS UNE SOLUTION PHYSIOLOGIQUE | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 06.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 15.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03042250 (BIOSYNTECH CANADA INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 11, line 4 - page 16, line 20 * * claims 1-44 * * example 5 *; | [X]US2003108511 (SAWHNEY AMARPREET S [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0117] * * examples 15-17 *; | [E]EP2196193 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0155] ** examples 2-5 * | International search | [X]US6566406 (PATHAK CHANDRASHEKHAR P [US], et al); | [A]US2005271727 (YAO FEI [US]); | [AP] - CHUNG T.G., LEE H.J., PARK Y., "Thermo-sensitive and biodegradable hydrogels based on stereocomplexed Pluronic multi-block copolymers for controlled protein delivery", J. CONTROL. RELEASE, (20071223), vol. 127, no. 1, pages 22 - 30, XP022523522 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2007.12.008 | [A] - TAGUCHI T. AND TANAKA J., "SWELLING BEHAVIOR OF HYALURONIC ACID AND TYPE II COLLAGEN HYDROGELS PREPARED BY USING CONVENTIONAL CROSSLINKING AND SUBSEQUENT ADDITIONAL POLYMER INTERACTIONS", J. BIOMATER. SCI. POLYM. ED., (20020101), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 43 - 52, XP009074198 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1163/156856202753525927 | [A] - J. BIOMED. MARKER RES. PART A, (2006), vol. 79, no. 4, pages 913 - 922, XP008113624 | [AP] - J. BIOMED. MATER. RES. PART A, (20070423), vol. 83, no. 2, pages 414 - 422, XP008112241 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jbm.a.31256 |