EP2122381 - REMOTELY ACTIVATABLE LOCATOR SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/48] | REMOTELY ACTIVATABLE LOCATOR SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2011/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TruePosition, Inc. 1000 Chesterbrook Boulevard Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | [2012/32] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states JJCK, LLC. 3801 Park Wood Drive Corinth, Texas 76208 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NALLEY, James, Elwood 3801 Park Wood Drive Corinth, Texas 76208 / US | 02 /
BUEHLER, Christopher, Daniel 7315 Blairview Drive Dallas, Texas 75230 / US | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Howson, Richard Giles Bentham, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Howson, Richard G.B., et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/03] | Ablett, Graham Keith Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London, W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Ablett, Graham Keith Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1M 1FD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08725471.0 | 12.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008US01845 | Priority number, date | US20070889426P | 12.02.2007 Original published format: US 889426 P | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008100506 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2122381 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2122381 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,GB,KR,US);
G01S5/0027 (GB);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | G01S1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | FERNAKTIVIERBARES LOKALISATIONSSYSTEM UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | [2011/47] | English: | REMOTELY ACTIVATABLE LOCATOR SYSTEM AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | [2011/47] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LOCALISATION POUVANT ÊTRE ACTIVÉ À DISTANCE ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2011/47] |
Former [2009/48] | ENTFERNT AKTIVIERBARES LOKALISATORSYSTEM UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2009/48] | REMOTELY ACTIVATABLE LOCATOR SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
Former [2009/48] | SYSTÈME RELEVEUR DE COORDONNÉES POUVANT ÊTRE ACTIVÉ À DISTANCE ET PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 15.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2008 | AT | 16.05.2012 | BE | 16.05.2012 | CY | 16.05.2012 | CZ | 16.05.2012 | DK | 16.05.2012 | EE | 16.05.2012 | HR | 16.05.2012 | LT | 16.05.2012 | LV | 16.05.2012 | MT | 16.05.2012 | PL | 16.05.2012 | RO | 16.05.2012 | SI | 16.05.2012 | SK | 16.05.2012 | TR | 16.05.2012 | BG | 16.08.2012 | NO | 16.08.2012 | GR | 17.08.2012 | IS | 16.09.2012 | PT | 17.09.2012 | LU | 12.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
NO | 16.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 16.05.2012 | |
NO | 16.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2394147 (HYPER ROSENFELD LTD [IL]) [A] 1,4,11,15,16 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 20 * * page 4, line 8 - page 7, line 13 *; | [IY]US2004203601 (MORRISS MATTHEW JAMES [US], et al) [I] 1,2,5,7,9,11,13-17 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0011] , [0012] , [0013] , [0015] , [0016] , [0020] , [0021] , [0026] , [0027] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0067] * [Y] 3,4,6,8,10,12; | [YA]US2004230823 (ZAKARIA ZIAD [CA]) [Y] 3,4,6,8,10,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] - [0007] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0021] * [A] 1,2,11,15,16; | [A]US2005153729 (LOGAN JAMES D [US], et al) [A] 1-4,6,8,10-12,15,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0113] ** paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0134] *; | [IA]EP1617639 (OMNIVISION TECH INC [US]) [I] 15,16 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0016] * [A] 1-4,6,8,10-12 | International search | [X]WO9626614 (GLOBAL LOCATING SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [Y]US6275164 (MACCONNELL JOHN W [US], et al); | [Y]US6593851 (BORNSTEIN AIMEE [US]) |