EP2118928 - METHOD OF FORMING HIGH DENSITY STRUCTURES AND LOW DENSITY STRUCTURES WITH A SINGLE PHOTOMASK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/47] | SEMICONDUCTOR CONSTRUCTIONS, METHODS OF FORMING MULTIPLE LINES, AND METHODS OF FORMING HIGH DENSITY STRUCTURES AND LOW DENSITY STRUCTURES WITH A SINGLE PHOTOMASK | ||
[2011/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 S. Federal Way P.O. Box 6 Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALAPATI, Ramakanth Sint Pauluslaan 62 3080 -Teruren / BE | 02 /
NIROOMAND, Ardavan Acacialaan 7 3040- Huldenberg / BE | 03 /
SANDHU, Gurtej, S. 2964 E. Parkriver Drive Boise, ID 83706 / US | [2010/08] |
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
ALAPATI, Ramakanth 2401 So. Apple Street, J101 Boise, ID 83706 / US | ||
02 /
NIROOMAND, Ardavan 5840 S. Horseshoe Place Boise, Idaho 83716 / US | |||
03 /
SANDHU, Gurtej, S. 2964 E. Parkriver Drive Boise, ID 83706 / US | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 08725624.4 | 15.02.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008US02012 | Priority number, date | US20070714378 | 05.03.2007 Original published format: US 714378 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008108921 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2118928 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2118928 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8247 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
H01L21/32139 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0337 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70433 (KR);
H01L21/0338 (KR);
H01L21/31144 (EP,KR,US);
H10B41/40 (EP,KR,US);
H10B41/48 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG VON STRUKTUREN MIT HOHER DICHTE UND STRUKTUREN MIT NIEDRIGER DICHTE MITHILFE EINER EINZELNEN FOTOMASKE | [2011/21] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING HIGH DENSITY STRUCTURES AND LOW DENSITY STRUCTURES WITH A SINGLE PHOTOMASK | [2011/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FORMER DES STRUCTURES HAUTE DENSITÉ ET DES STRUCTURES BASSE DENSITÉ AVEC UN PHOTOMASQUE SIMPLE | [2011/21] |
Former [2009/47] | HALBLEITERKONSTRUKTIONEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG MEHRERER LEITUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG VON STRUKTUREN MIT HOHER DICHTE UND STRUKTUREN MIT NIEDRIGER DICHTE MITHILFE EINER EINZELNEN FOTOMASKE | ||
Former [2009/47] | SEMICONDUCTOR CONSTRUCTIONS, METHODS OF FORMING MULTIPLE LINES, AND METHODS OF FORMING HIGH DENSITY STRUCTURES AND LOW DENSITY STRUCTURES WITH A SINGLE PHOTOMASK | ||
Former [2009/47] | CONSTRUCTIONS SEMI-CONDUCTRICES, PROCÉDÉS POUR FORMER DE MULTIPLES LIGNES, ET PROCÉDÉS POUR FORMER DES STRUCTURES HAUTE DENSITÉ ET DES STRUCTURES BASSE DENSITÉ AVEC UN PHOTOMASQUE SIMPLE | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 06.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2008 | AT | 12.10.2011 | BE | 12.10.2011 | CY | 12.10.2011 | CZ | 12.10.2011 | DK | 12.10.2011 | EE | 12.10.2011 | FI | 12.10.2011 | HR | 12.10.2011 | IT | 12.10.2011 | LT | 12.10.2011 | LV | 12.10.2011 | MT | 12.10.2011 | NL | 12.10.2011 | PL | 12.10.2011 | RO | 12.10.2011 | SE | 12.10.2011 | SI | 12.10.2011 | SK | 12.10.2011 | TR | 12.10.2011 | BG | 12.01.2012 | NO | 12.01.2012 | GR | 13.01.2012 | ES | 23.01.2012 | IS | 12.02.2012 | PT | 13.02.2012 | IE | 15.02.2012 | LU | 15.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | FR | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
TR | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
LU | 15.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
TR | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
NO | 12.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6417086 (OSARI KANJI [JP]) [Y] 10,20-22,35-43 * column 7, line 6 - column 8, line 63; figures 2,3 *; | [XY]US2006234165 (KAMIGAKI TETSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,11-19,23-34,44-65 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0035]; figures 2-15 * [Y] 10,20-22,35-43; | [XP]US2007238053 (HASHIMOTO KOJI [JP]) [XP] 1-9,11-19,23-34,44-65* paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0096]; figures 4-17 * |