EP2171560 - VIDEO MOTION MENU GENERATION IN A LOW MEMORY ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSI Corporation 1621 Barber Lane Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Laszlo 2327 Pinard Street Milpitas, California 95035 / US | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2014/44] |
Former [2010/14] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 08726359.6 | 03.03.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008US02802 | Priority number, date | US20070749809 | 17.05.2007 Original published format: US 749809 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008143732 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2171560 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/00, G06F17/30 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (KR);
H04N21/431 (KR);
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/4314 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/14] | G06F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | VIDEOBEWEGUNGSMENÜERZEUGUNG IN EINER UMGEBUNG MIT WENIG SPEICHER | [2010/14] | English: | VIDEO MOTION MENU GENERATION IN A LOW MEMORY ENVIRONMENT | [2010/14] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE MENU À ANIMATION VIDÉO DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT À FAIBLE MÉMOIRE | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 29.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2012 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 07.09.2012 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 17.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/35] | 21.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2339989 (LSI LOGIC CORP [US]) [A] 1,8,9,15 * abstract *; | [IA]US2004128317 (SULL SANGHOON [KR], et al) [I] 1,5-9,13,15 * figures 2A,5A,12B,14A,14B * * paragraphs [0057] - [0059] - [0140] , [0156] , [0160] , [0201] , [0202] , [0207] * [A] 2-4,10-12,14; | [YA]US2006230427 (KUNKEL GERARD [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,10-12,14 * figures 2,5,6 * * paragraphs [0054] , [0076] , [0082] , [0085] , [0086] , [0092] , [0100] , [0120] , [0151] , [0152] *[A] 1,9,15; | [IY]WO2007015047 (NDS LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1,6-9,13,15 * figures 4,7,13,22,32 * * page 21, line 1 - line 22 * * page 23, line 1 - line 13 * * page 25, line 28 - line 31 * * page 28, line 1 - line 7 * * page 29, line 12 - line 25 * * page 45, line 29 - line 31 * * page 47, line 19 - line 20 * * page 54, line 26 - page 55, line 16 * [Y] 2-4,10-12,14 | International search | [Y]US2006048065 (TANG WEN-SEN [TW], et al); | [Y]US2001019336 (GORDON DONALD [US], et al); | [A]US2005278634 (CHEN KAIHU [TW], et al); | [A]US2005289466 (CHEN KAIHU [TW]) | Examination | US2003156824 | US2006110128 | by applicant | WO2007015047 | US2004128317 | GB2339989 | US2006230427 |