EP2137917 - MIMO WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING AND DECODING RESOURCE BLOCK STRUCTURES BASED ON A DEDICATED REFERENCE SIGNAL MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Technology Corporation 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2013/15] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Interdigital Technology Corporation 3411, Silverside Road Concord Pl., Ste 105, Hagley Bldg Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAN, Kyle Jung-lin 43 Avalon Circle Smithtown, New York 11787 / US | 02 /
GRIECO, Donald M. 18 Shore Road Manhassett, New York 11030 / US | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Hjalmarsson, Magnus Axel Awapatent AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 08727083.1 | 20.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008US03777 | Priority number, date | US20070896093P | 21.03.2007 Original published format: US 896093 P | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008115588 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2137917 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
H04B7/0426 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/0228 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/0224 (US);
H04B7/0413 (US);
H04B7/0456 (KR,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/02 (KR);
H04L25/0204 (KR);
H04L25/03343 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/005 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0051 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES MIMO-KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND DEKODIEREN VON RESSOURCENBLOCKSTRUKTUREN AUF DER BASIS EINES DEDIZIERTEN REFERENZSIGNALMODUS | [2010/01] | English: | MIMO WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING AND DECODING RESOURCE BLOCK STRUCTURES BASED ON A DEDICATED REFERENCE SIGNAL MODE | [2010/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION MIMO POUR L'ÉMISSION ET LE DÉCODAGE DE STRUCTURES DE BLOCS DE RESSOURCES SUR LA BASE D'UN MODE À SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE DÉDIÉ | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/36] | 24.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.04.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/36] | Divisional application(s) | EP13154039.5 / EP2605466 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006018287 (WALTON JAY R [US], et al) [X] 1,12,13,24,25,34,35,44,45,47,49,51 * abstract * * claims 1-3,37,38 ** figures 3-5 *; | [X]WO2006134949 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,13,17,25,35,45-52,60 * the whole document *; | EP1898542 [ ] (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * column 5, paragraph 14 - column 6, paragraph 21 * * column 8, paragraph 35 - column 9, paragraph 40 * * column 11, paragraph 52 - column 15, paragraph 63 * * column 16, paragraph 68 * * column 18, paragraph 75 * * figures 2-4,8,10,12-14 *; | [X] - MOTOROLA, "Proposal for Dedicated Pilots in Downlink Precoding for EUTRA MIMO", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP); TECHNICALSPECIFICATION GROUP (TSG) RADIO ACCESS NETWORK (RAN); WORKINGGROUP 1 (WG1), MEETING #48, 3 GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #48 ST. LOUIS, vol. R1-070770, (20070212), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_48/Docs/R1-070770.zip, (20080904), XP002494688 [X] 1,13 * the whole document * | [X] - CATT, "Downlink dedicated reference signal structure for adaptive beam-forming in EUTRA TDD", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP); TECHNICALSPECIFICATION GROUP (TSG) RADIO ACCESS NETWORK (RAN); WORKINGGROUP 1 (WG1), MEETING #47, 3 GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #47, RIGA, vol. R1-063286, (20061106), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_47/Docs/R1-063286.zip, XP002494689 [X] 1,13 * the whole document * |