EP2119263 - SYSTEM AND METH0D FOR GENERATING A LOCATION ESTIMATE USING NON-UNIFORM GRID POINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andrew Corporation 3 Westbrook Corporate Center Westchester, IL 60154 / US | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLES, Martin 3230 Lima Place Dulles, Virginia 22189-3230 / US | 02 /
JOHN, Carlson 3101 Pine Oaks Way Herndon, VA 20171 / US | 03 /
GEORGE, Maher 100 Adele Garden Way Herndon, VA 20170 / US | 04 /
MAZLUM, Selcuk 136 Clubhouse Drive SW, Apt. 201 Leesburg, VA 20175 / US | [2010/05] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
ALLES, Martin 3230 Lima Place Dulles, Virginia 22189-3230 / US | ||
02 /
JOHN, Carlson 3101 Pine Oaks Way Herndon, VA 20171 / US | |||
03 /
GEORGE, Maher 100 Adele Garden Way Herndon, VA 20170 / US | |||
04 /
SELCUK, Mazlum 136 Clubhouse Drive SW, Apt.201 Leesburg, VA 21075 / US | |||
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
ALLES, Martin 3230 Lima Place Dulles, Virginia 20189 / US | ||
02 /
JOHN, Carlson 3101 Pine Oaks Way Herndon, VA 20171 / US | |||
03 /
GEORGE, Maher 100 Adele Garden Way Herndon, VA 20170 / US | |||
04 /
SELCUK, Mazlum 136 Clubhouse Drive SW, Apt.201 Leesburg, VA 21075 / US | |||
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
ALLES, Martin 3230 Lima Place Dulles, Virginia 20189 / US | ||
02 /
JOHN, Carlson 3101 Pine Oaks Way Herndon, VA 20171 / US | |||
03 /
GEORGE, Maher 100 Adele Garden Way Herndon, VA 20170 / US | |||
04 /
SELCUK, Mazlum 7144 Canterbury Court Frederick, VA 21073 / US | |||
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
MARTIN, Alles 2421 Williams Avenue Vienna, VA 22180 / US | ||
02 /
JOHN, Carlson 3101 Pine Oaks Way Herndon, VA 20171 / US | |||
03 /
GEORGE, Maher 100 Adele Garden Way Herndon, VA 20170 / US | |||
04 /
SELCUK, Mazlum 7144 Canterbury Court Frederick, VA 21073 / US | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08728229.9 | 24.01.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008US51929 | Priority number, date | US20070899379P | 05.02.2007 Original published format: US 899379 P | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008097725 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119263 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2119263 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
G01S5/021 (EP,US);
G01S5/0244 (EP,US);
G01S5/02526 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/029 (US)
|
Former IPC [2010/09] | G06G7/78 | ||
Former IPC [2009/48] | H04W84/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/47] | H04Q7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER POSITIONSSCHÄTZUNG MITHILFE NICHT GLEICHFÖRMIGER RASTERPUNKTE | [2009/47] | English: | SYSTEM AND METH0D FOR GENERATING A LOCATION ESTIMATE USING NON-UNIFORM GRID POINTS | [2009/47] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR GÉNÉRER UNE ESTIMATION D'EMPLACEMENT À L'AIDE DE POINTS DE GRILLE NON UNIFORMES | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 21.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2008 | AT | 04.05.2011 | BE | 04.05.2011 | CY | 04.05.2011 | CZ | 04.05.2011 | DK | 04.05.2011 | EE | 04.05.2011 | FI | 04.05.2011 | HR | 04.05.2011 | IT | 04.05.2011 | LT | 04.05.2011 | LV | 04.05.2011 | MT | 04.05.2011 | NL | 04.05.2011 | PL | 04.05.2011 | RO | 04.05.2011 | SE | 04.05.2011 | SI | 04.05.2011 | SK | 04.05.2011 | TR | 04.05.2011 | BG | 04.08.2011 | NO | 04.08.2011 | GR | 05.08.2011 | ES | 15.08.2011 | IS | 04.09.2011 | PT | 05.09.2011 | IE | 24.01.2012 | LU | 24.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
HR | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
MT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
TR | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
IE | 24.01.2012 | ||
LU | 24.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
HR | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
MT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
TR | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
IE | 24.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
HR | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
MT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
IE | 24.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
MT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 24.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 24.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
IE | 24.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
BE | 04.05.2011 | ||
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 04.05.2011 | |
CY | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 04.05.2011 | |
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 04.05.2011 | |
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02082832 (AT & T WIRELESS SERVICES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * page 21, line 30 - page 23, line 19; figure 14 *; | [X]EP1471688 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1,5,6,18,20 * paragraphs [0026] - [0046]; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US2005266855 (ZENG GUANG [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0018] - [0049]; figures 2,3 * [Y] 16,17; | [Y]US2006276201 (DUPRAY DENNIS J [US]) [Y] 16,17* paragraphs [0081] - [0083] - [0238] - [0274] * | International search | [Y]US2004180671 (SPAIN DAVID STEVENSON [US]); | [Y]US2006030333 (WARD MATTHEW L [US], et al); | [Y]US2006230018 (GRICHNIK ANTHONY J [US], et al) |