EP2116089 - USING A SINGLE FHT TO DECODE ACCESS-BASED HANDOFF PROBES FROM MUTIPLE USERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHANDEKAR, Aamod 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
GOROKHOV, Alexei 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
BHUSHAN, Naga 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 08728592.0 | 30.01.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008US52505 | Priority number, date | US20070887341P | 30.01.2007 Original published format: US 887341 P | US20080021961 | 29.01.2008 Original published format: US 21961 | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008095023 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2116089 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
H04J13/0048 (EP,US);
H04J13/00 (KR);
H04L27/26 (KR);
H04B2001/70935 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70707 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/46] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES EINZEL-FHT ZUR ENTSCHLÜSSELUNG VON SONDEN FÜR ZUGANGSBASIERTE ÜBERGABE VON MEHREREN BENUTZERN | [2009/46] | English: | USING A SINGLE FHT TO DECODE ACCESS-BASED HANDOFF PROBES FROM MUTIPLE USERS | [2009/46] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE FHT UNIQUE POUR DÉCODER DES SONDES DE TRANSFERT SUR LA BASE DE L'ACCÈS DE PLUSIEURS UTILISATEURS | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 30.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/03] | 02.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9925080 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]WO03017621 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) |