EP2132466 - APPARATUS TO REGULATE FLUID FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tescom Corporation 12616 Industrial Blvd. Elk River, MN 55330 / US | [2009/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALTON, James, Matthew 12236 195th Ln. Nw Elk River, MN 55330 / US | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08728703.3 | 31.01.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008US52639 | Priority number, date | US20070711962 | 28.02.2007 Original published format: US 711962 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008106266 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2132466 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2132466 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/38, G05D7/01 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
F16K1/385 (EP,US);
G05D16/0622 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7819 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STRÖMUNGSREGELUNG | [2009/51] | English: | APPARATUS TO REGULATE FLUID FLOW | [2009/51] | French: | APPAREIL DESTINÉ À RÉGULER L'ÉCOULEMENT D'UN FLUIDE | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 16.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2008 | AT | 03.10.2012 | BE | 03.10.2012 | CY | 03.10.2012 | CZ | 03.10.2012 | DK | 03.10.2012 | EE | 03.10.2012 | FI | 03.10.2012 | HR | 03.10.2012 | IT | 03.10.2012 | LT | 03.10.2012 | LV | 03.10.2012 | MT | 03.10.2012 | NL | 03.10.2012 | PL | 03.10.2012 | RO | 03.10.2012 | SE | 03.10.2012 | SI | 03.10.2012 | SK | 03.10.2012 | TR | 03.10.2012 | BG | 03.01.2013 | NO | 03.01.2013 | GR | 04.01.2013 | ES | 14.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | IE | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | LU | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | IS | 03.02.2013 | PT | 04.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
IE | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
IE | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
IE | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 03.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XA]CH241493 (KUGLER FONDERIE ROBINETTERIE [CH]) [X] 1-5,9-11 * page 3, line 31 - line 94; figures 8-10 * [A] 12; | [A]GB709358 (SHELL REFINING & MARKETING CO) [A] 1,6-8,12,16,17 * figure 2 *; | [A]US3233626 (HIERS JAMES E, et al) [A] 1,12 * figure - *; | [XA]FR2225667 (CLEMENT ANDRE [FR]) [X] 1-5,7,9-11 * the whole document * [A] 12; | [A]US3906982 (FLEISCHHACKER JOSEPH F, et al) [A] 1,6-8,12,16,17* abstract *; | [X]US4051870 (NORDENTOFT LARS) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 33; figure 1 *; | [XA]US4249717 (THOMPSON WILLIAM S [US]) [X] 1-5,7,9-11 * the whole document * [A] 12; | [X]FR2500186 (TORO CO [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 35; figures 5,6 *; | [X]US2003197140 (GREEN CHRIS [CA]) [X] 1-3,5-14,16-20 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0031]; figure - * |