EP2117722 - MODULAR SYSTEM FOR THE DELIVERY OF HOT MELT ADHESIVE OR OTHER THERMOPLASTIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCGUFFEY, Grant 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60026 / US | 02 /
BOURGET, Daniel, D. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60026 / US | 03 /
SCHOTTEN, Christof 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60026 / US | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Mäuerchen 16 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 08728843.7 | 01.02.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008US52818 | Priority number, date | US20070705060 | 12.02.2007 Original published format: US 705060 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008100721 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117722 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2117722 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/00, B05C5/02 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
B05C5/0279 (EP,US);
B05C11/10 (KR);
B05C11/1042 (EP,US);
B05C19/06 (KR);
B05C5/00 (KR);
B05C5/001 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | MODULARES SYSTEM ZUR LIEFERUNG EINES HAFTMITTELS ODER ANDERER THERMOPLASTISCHER MATERIALIEN MIT HOHER SCHMELZUNG | [2009/47] | English: | MODULAR SYSTEM FOR THE DELIVERY OF HOT MELT ADHESIVE OR OTHER THERMOPLASTIC MATERIALS | [2009/47] | French: | SYSTÈME MODULAIRE POUR LA FOURNITURE D'ADHÉSIF THERMOFUSIBLE OU D'AUTRES MATÉRIAUX THERMOPLASTIQUES | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.12.2010 | CY | 08.12.2010 | CZ | 08.12.2010 | DK | 08.12.2010 | EE | 08.12.2010 | FI | 08.12.2010 | HR | 08.12.2010 | HU | 08.12.2010 | LT | 08.12.2010 | LV | 08.12.2010 | MT | 08.12.2010 | RO | 08.12.2010 | SI | 08.12.2010 | SK | 08.12.2010 | IE | 01.02.2011 | LU | 01.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | BG | 08.03.2011 | NO | 08.03.2011 | GR | 09.03.2011 | IS | 08.04.2011 | PT | 08.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.02.2011 | ||
LU | 01.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5605720 (ALLEN MARTIN A [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0936000 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9954055 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US6089413 (RINEY JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US6422428 (ALLEN MARTIN A [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1591167 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [X] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | US5605720 | WO9954055 | US6089413 | US6422428 | EP1591167 |