EP2126073 - GENE SILENCING BY SINGLE-STRANDED POLYNUCLEOTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genesegues, Inc. 3180 High Point Drive Chaska, MN 55318 / US | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNGER, Gretchen M. 3180 High Point Drive Chaska, Minnesota 55318 / US | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08728878.3 | 01.02.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008US52863 | Priority number, date | US20070898674P | 01.02.2007 Original published format: US 898674 P | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008095192 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2126073 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C12N15/09 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/7125 (EP,US);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
G01N33/5308 (US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321 (EP,US);
C12N2310/51 (EP,US);
C12N2320/32 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | GEN-SILENCING MITHILFE EINSTRÄNGIGER POLYNUKLEOTIDE | [2009/49] | English: | GENE SILENCING BY SINGLE-STRANDED POLYNUCLEOTIDES | [2009/49] | French: | BLOCAGE DE GENE PAR POLY(NUCLEOTIDES) MONOBRINS | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 23.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 22.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006066154 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US]; SLATON JOEL W [US]; AHMED KHALIL [US]; UNGER GRET) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * examples 6-7; table 5; sequences 5-6 *; | [A]WO2005097993 (COLEY PHARM GROUP INC [US]; COLEY PHARM GMBH [DE]; LIPFORD GRAYSON B [) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - AHMAD KASHIF A ET AL, "Targeting CK2 for cancer therapy", ANTI-CANCER DRUGS, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US; NL LNKD- DOI:10.1097/00001813-200511000-00001, (20051101), vol. 16, no. 10, ISSN 0959-4973, pages 1037 - 1043, XP009104787 [Y] 1-6,8-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00001813-200511000-00001 | [Y] - GUIXIA WANG ET AL, "Downregulation of CK2 induces apoptosis in cancer cells - A potential approach to cancer therapy", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20050601), vol. 274, no. 1-2, ISSN 1573-4919, pages 77 - 84, XP019288784 [Y] 1-6,8-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - SIMEONI F ET AL, "Insight into the mechanism of the peptide-based gene delivery system MPG: implications for delivery of siRNA into mammalian cells", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1093/NAR/GKG385, (20030313), vol. 31, no. 11, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 2717 - 2724, XP002984580 [Y] 7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkg385 | [A] - PEPPERKOK R ET AL, "Cell growth stimulation by EGF: Inhibition through antisense-oligodeoxynucleotides demonstrates important role of casein kinase II", EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0014-4827(91)90429-X, vol. 197, no. 2, ISSN 0014-4827, (19911201), pages 245 - 253, (19911201), XP024791949 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-4827(91)90429-X | [A] - OHRT THOMAS ET AL, "In situ fluorescence analysis demonstrates active siRNA exclusion from the nucleus by Exportin 5", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 34, no. 5, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 1369 - 1380, XP002598041 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkl001 | [A] - GRUENWELLER ARNOLD ET AL, "Comparison of different antisense strategies in mammalian cells using locked nucleic acids, 2'-O-methyl RNA, phosphorothioates and small interfering RNA.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20030615), vol. 31, no. 12, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 3185 - 3193, XP002598042 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkg409 | [A] - KANDIMALLA EKAMBAR R ET AL, "Mixed backbone antisense oligonucleotides: Design, biochemical and biological properties of oligonucleotides containing 2'-5'-ribo- and 3'-5'-deoxyribonucleotide segments", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 25, no. 2, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 370 - 378, XP002598043 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.2.370 | [T] - UI-TEI KUMIKO ET AL, "Functional dissection of siRNA sequence by systematic DNA substitution: modified siRNA with a DNA seed arm is a powerful tool for mammalian gene silencing with significantly reduced off-target effect", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (200804), vol. 36, no. 7, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 2136 - 2151, XP002598044 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkn042 |