EP2109785 - PUMPING IN A HIGHER- ORDER MODE THAT IS SUBSTANTIALLY IDENTICAL TO A SIGNAL MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric North America Inc. (a Delaware Corporation) 2000 Northeast Expressway Suite 2H02 Norcross GA 30071 / US | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIGIOVANNI, David, J. 41 Lookout Road Mountain Lakes, NJ 07046 / US | 02 /
HEADLEY, Clifford, E. 17 Aberdeen Circle Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | [2009/43] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2009/43] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08729063.1 | 05.02.2008 | [2009/43] | WO2008US53071 | Priority number, date | US20070888114P | 05.02.2007 Original published format: US 888114 P | [2009/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008097988 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2109785 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/02, H01S3/067, G02B6/14, // G02B6/42, H01S3/094 | [2014/22] | CPC: |
G02B6/02019 (EP,US);
H01S3/06733 (US);
G02B6/02023 (EP,US);
G02B6/14 (EP,US);
H01S3/0672 (US);
H01S3/094038 (US);
G02B6/02095 (EP,US);
G02B6/02366 (EP,US);
G02B6/03633 (EP,US);
G02B6/4296 (EP,US);
H01S2301/03 (EP,US);
H01S2301/20 (US);
H01S3/06741 (US);
H01S3/06754 (EP,US);
H01S3/0804 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/43] | G02B6/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/43] | Title | German: | PUMPVORGÄNGE IN EINEM MIT EINEM SIGNALMODUS SUBSTANTIELL IDENTISCHEN MODUS HÖHERER ORDNUNG | [2009/43] | English: | PUMPING IN A HIGHER- ORDER MODE THAT IS SUBSTANTIALLY IDENTICAL TO A SIGNAL MODE | [2009/43] | French: | POMPAGE DANS UN MODE D'ORDRE SUPÉRIEUR QUI EST SENSIBLEMENT IDENTIQUE À UN MODE DE SIGNAL | [2009/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 20.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/08] | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2001043388 (DANZIGER YOCHAY [IL], et al) [X] 2,7-9,12 * figures 4a,4b * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0054] * [Y] 1,10,11; | [Y]US2002126956 (BOUTEILLER JEAN-CHRISTOPHE [US], et al) [Y] 10,11* abstract *; | [A]US2002164140 (LYSIANSKY MICHAEL [IL], et al) [A] 1,2,12 * figure 16 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0072] *; | [XY]US2006103919 (DIGIOVANNI DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 12-14 * figures 9,10 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0048] * [Y] 1; | [A] - S. RAMACHANDRAN ET AL., "Evolution and systems impact of MPI in HOM fiber devices", ECOC 2003, (2003), XP040379891 [A] 1,2,12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4895421 (KIM BYOUNG Y [US], et al); | [X]US2006103919 (DIGIOVANNI DAVID J [US], et al) | Examination | US5966481 | US2001026396 | US2003002794 | US6950578 |