EP2118765 - TAILORING AN OPERATING SYSTEM TO A COMPUTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAREEN, Bhrighu c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
ANSARI, Zubair c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
KARKI, Mukesh c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08729095.3 | 05.02.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008US53105 | Priority number, date | US20070702310 | 05.02.2007 Original published format: US 702310 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008098017 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2118765 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F9/445 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
G06F9/44505 (EP,US);
G06F8/61 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | ZUSCHNEIDUNG EINES BETRIEBSSYSTEMS AUF EIN COMPUTERSYSTEM | [2009/47] | English: | TAILORING AN OPERATING SYSTEM TO A COMPUTER SYSTEM | [2009/47] | French: | ADAPTATION D'UN SYSTÈME D'EXPLOITATION À UN SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 29.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0474578 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 24 - line 52; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9604603 (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 23 ** claim 1 *; | [A]US6671802 (OTT DONNA E [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US6959330 (MCILROY GUY [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 16 * * column 9, line 44 - column 50; figures 9a, 9b *; | [A]US2006005016 (LEE SAM J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] *; | [A] - FRIEDRICH L F ET AL, A survey of configurable, component-based operating systems for embedded applications, IEEE MICRO, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, PAGE(S) 54 - 68, (20010501), ISSN 0272-1732, XP002963814 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 54 - page 55, column r, line 19 * * page 56, column r, line 35 - line l * * page 58, column l, line 27 - column r, line 8 * * page 60, column r, line 9 - line 10 * * page 61, column l, line 36 - line 40 * * page 66, column l, line 6 - column r, line 27 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/40.928765 | International search | [A]US6351850 (VAN GILLUWE FRANK [US], et al); | [A]US6370686 (DELO JOHN C [US], et al); | [A]US6446260 (WILDE MARTIN [US], et al); | [A]US7155713 (BURKHARDT RYAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US6671802 | - L. F. FRIEDRICH ET AL., A SURVEY OF CONFIGURABLE, COMPONENT-BASED OPERATING SYSTEMS FOR EMBEDDED APPLICATIONS, (20010501), pages 54 - 68 |