EP2126916 - SYSTEM HAVING ONE OR MORE MEMORY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2016 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conversant Intellectual Property Management Inc. 390 March Road Suite 100 Ottawa, ON K2K 0G7 / CA | [2014/44] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Mosaid Technologies Incorporated 11 Hines Road, Suite 203 Ottawa, ON K2K 2X1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, HakJune 21 Cambior Crescent Kanata, ON K2T 1J3 / CA | 02 /
PRZYBYLSKI, Steven 5630 Meado Lane Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | 03 /
PYEON, Hong, Beom 16 Rivergreen Crescent Kanata, ON K2M 2E1 / CA | 04 /
SCHUETZ, Roland 115 Rideau Terrace Ottawa, ON K1M 0Y8 / CA | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Lang, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08730166.9 | 19.02.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008US54307 | Priority number, date | US20070902003P | 16.02.2007 Original published format: US 902003 P | US20070892705P | 02.03.2007 Original published format: US 892705 P | US20070840692 | 17.08.2007 Original published format: US 840692 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008101246 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2126916 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/10 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
G11C7/1045 (EP,US);
G11C7/22 (KR);
G06F13/1678 (EP,US);
G11C7/10 (EP,KR,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT EINER ODER MEHREREN SPEICHERVORRICHTUNGEN | [2009/49] | English: | SYSTEM HAVING ONE OR MORE MEMORY DEVICES | [2009/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DOTÉ D'UN OU PLUSIEURS DISPOSITIF(S) DE MÉMOIRE | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 11.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006248305 (FANG WAYNE [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * paragraphs [0017] , [0035] - [0038] *; | [A]US2004186956 (PEREGO RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0135] * |