EP2126867 - SELECTION OF MOBILE STATION ALERT BASED ON SOCIAL CONTEXT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | [2011/09] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOCK, Von 8114 Rose Marie Circle Boynton Beach, FL 33437 / US | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08730504.1 | 22.02.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008US54713 | Priority number, date | US20070686829 | 15.03.2007 Original published format: US 686829 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008112405 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2126867 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/00 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
G08B25/08 (EP,US);
G08B21/00 (KR);
G08B25/14 (EP,US);
H04M19/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | AUSWAHL VON ALARMEN FÜR EINE MOBILSTATION AUF BASIS DES SOZIALEN KONTEXTS | [2009/49] | English: | SELECTION OF MOBILE STATION ALERT BASED ON SOCIAL CONTEXT | [2009/49] | French: | SÉLECTION D'UNE ALERTE DE STATION MOBILE SELON LE CONTEXTE SOCIAL | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 27.07.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]KR20060008065 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [X]KR20020014604 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]KR20060108859 (PANTECH CO LTD [KR]); | [X]KR20050028992 (SK TELETEC CO LTD [KR]) |