EP2122021 - CO-EXTRUDED TISSUE GRASPING MONOFILAMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon, Inc U.S. Route 22 Somerville, NJ 08876-0151 / US | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Gaoyuan 218 Fairfield Lane Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | 02 /
YUAN, J. Jenny 8 Christie Way Branchburg, New Jersey 08853 / US | 03 /
MATRUNICH, James A. 248 Old Tote Road Mountainside, New Jersey 07092 / US | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Schohe, Stefan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Schohe, Stefan Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Schohe, Stefan Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08730690.8 | 26.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008US54934 | Priority number, date | US20070684027 | 09.03.2007 Original published format: US 684027 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008112417 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2122021 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2122021 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D01F8/14, A61B17/06, A61L17/12 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
A61B17/06166 (EP,US);
A61L17/12 (EP,US);
D01F8/14 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06176 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | D01F8/14, A61B17/04, A61L17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOEXTRUDIERTES MONOFILAMENT ZUR GEWEBEERGREIFUNG | [2009/48] | English: | CO-EXTRUDED TISSUE GRASPING MONOFILAMENT | [2009/48] | French: | MONOFILAMENT CO-EXTRUDÉ DE SAISIE DE TISSU | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.08.2013 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 29.08.2013 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 04.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2008 | AT | 08.01.2014 | BE | 08.01.2014 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | HR | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | MT | 08.01.2014 | NL | 08.01.2014 | PL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | SE | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | LU | 26.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | NO | 08.04.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 26.02.2008 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03083191 (SAMYANG CORP [KR]) [Y] 1-3,6-8,14,18,20,21 * abstract * * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 15 * * figures 1b,2,3b * * page 16; table 5 * * page 9, line 18 - page 10, line 3 *; | [Y]WO9852473 (BUNCKE HARRY J [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-8 * page 14, line 22 - page 16, line 22 * * figures 13-18 * * page 1, line 15 - line 20 *; | [XY]US3700544 (MATSUI MASAO) [X] 25 * figure 4; claim 1 * * figures 14,15 * * abstract * [Y] 14; | [Y]US3458390 (ANDO SATOSHI, et al) [Y] 18,20,21 * figure 18 * * abstract *; | [A]US2007005109 (POPADIUK NICHOLAS M [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * page 1, paragraphs 1,4,5 * * page 2, paragraphs 18-20,23 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO03017850 (QUILL MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * page 8, line 25 - line 28 * * figures 1-5,17-22 *; | [A]US6420027 (KIMURA YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-25 * figure 1; examples 1-9; table 1 * * column 1, line 10 - line 23 * | by applicant | WO03083191 | WO9852473 | US3458390 |