EP2127312 - SELF-INITIATED END-TO-END MONITORING FOR AUTHENTICATION GATEWAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive, SJC/10/2/1 San Jose CA 95134-1706 / US | [2018/50] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive, SJC/10/2/1 San Jose CA 95134-1706 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Pok 1438 Park Entrance Drive San Jose, California 95131 / US | 02 /
MEHTA, Sunil Bhupatrai 155 Wortham Court Mountain View, California 94040 / US | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Jarrett, Daniel Phillip, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2018/50] |
Former [2009/49] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08730896.1 | 28.02.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008US55204 | Priority number, date | US20070680425 | 28.02.2007 Original published format: US 680425 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008106568 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2127312 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2127312 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/26 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
H04L63/1433 (EP,US);
H04L43/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/50] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBST-INITIERTE END-TO-END-ÜBERWACHUNG FÜR EINEN AUTHENTIKATIONSGATEWAY | [2018/21] | English: | SELF-INITIATED END-TO-END MONITORING FOR AUTHENTICATION GATEWAY | [2009/49] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DE BOUT EN BOUT AUTOMATIQUE POUR PASSERELLE D'AUTHENTIFICATION | [2009/49] |
Former [2009/49] | SELBSTEINGELEITETE END-TO-END-ÜBERWACHUNG FÜR EIN AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSGATEWAY | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 22.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 31.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2008 | AT | 12.12.2018 | CY | 12.12.2018 | CZ | 12.12.2018 | DK | 12.12.2018 | EE | 12.12.2018 | ES | 12.12.2018 | FI | 12.12.2018 | HR | 12.12.2018 | IT | 12.12.2018 | LT | 12.12.2018 | LV | 12.12.2018 | MC | 12.12.2018 | NL | 12.12.2018 | PL | 12.12.2018 | RO | 12.12.2018 | SE | 12.12.2018 | SI | 12.12.2018 | SK | 12.12.2018 | TR | 12.12.2018 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | IE | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | LU | 28.02.2019 | MT | 28.02.2019 | BG | 12.03.2019 | NO | 12.03.2019 | GR | 13.03.2019 | IS | 12.04.2019 | PT | 12.04.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 12.12.2018 | |
NO | 12.03.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004036444 (BLADE SOFTWARE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20* claim 1 *; | [X]US2005076238 (ORMAZABAL GASTON S [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0009] - [0014] - [0021] , [0120] , [0125] * |