EP2119133 - REDUNDANT MULTICAST SERVICE IN WIRELESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITCHIN, Duncan 2465 NW 145th Ave Beaverton, OR 97006 / US | 02 /
VENKATACHALAM, Muthaiah 16620 NW Paddington Dr. Beaverton, OR 97006 / US | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Clarke, Jeffrey David HGF Limited 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Clarke, Jeffrey Harrison Goddard Foote 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | ||
Former [2009/47] | Clarke, Jeffrey Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08731146.0 | 29.02.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008US55522 | Priority number, date | US20070714371 | 06.03.2007 Original published format: US 714371 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008109453 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119133 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2119133 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18, H04L1/08, // H04W84/12 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
H04L12/1863 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04L1/004 (EP,US);
H04L12/1881 (EP,US);
H04L12/189 (EP,US);
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W72/121 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | REDUNDANTER MULTICAST-DIENST IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN NETZ | [2012/22] | English: | REDUNDANT MULTICAST SERVICE IN WIRELESS NETWORK | [2009/47] | French: | SERVICE DE MULTIDIFFUSION REDONDANT DANS UN RÉSEAU SANS FIL | [2009/47] |
Former [2009/47] | REDUNDANTER MULTICAST-DIENST IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERK | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 24.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.02.2008 | AT | 17.10.2012 | BE | 17.10.2012 | CY | 17.10.2012 | CZ | 17.10.2012 | DK | 17.10.2012 | EE | 17.10.2012 | FI | 17.10.2012 | HR | 17.10.2012 | IT | 17.10.2012 | LT | 17.10.2012 | LV | 17.10.2012 | MT | 17.10.2012 | NL | 17.10.2012 | PL | 17.10.2012 | RO | 17.10.2012 | SE | 17.10.2012 | SI | 17.10.2012 | SK | 17.10.2012 | TR | 17.10.2012 | BG | 17.01.2013 | NO | 17.01.2013 | GR | 18.01.2013 | ES | 28.01.2013 | IS | 17.02.2013 | PT | 18.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | FR | 28.02.2013 | IE | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | LU | 28.02.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
TR | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
MT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
HR | 17.10.2012 | ||
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
LV | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
PL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
LT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
IS | 17.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 17.10.2012 | |
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
NO | 17.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 17.10.2012 | |
NO | 17.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2002118666 (STANWOOD KENNETH L [US], et al) [Y] 3,8 * page 7, paragraph 77 - page 8, paragraph 84; figure 12 * [A] 1,5,6; | [XYI]EP1427146 (NEC INFRONTIA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * page 2, paragraph 5 - page 3, paragraph 13 * * page 5, paragraph 33 - page 6, paragraph 47; figures 1-4 * [Y] 3,8 [I] 9; | [AP] - MIKAEL STERNAD ET AL, "Towards Systems Beyond 3G Based on Adaptive OFDMA Transmission", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/JPROC.2007.907119, (20071201), vol. 95, no. 12, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 2432 - 2455, XP011197861 [AP] 3,8 * page 2435, paragraphs D. Duplexing, Frames, and Slots * * [9] IEEE Standard for Local and Metropolitan Area Networks, Part 16: Air Interface for Fixed Broadband Wireless Access Systems , IEEE P802.16a/D12, Feb. 2005; page 2451, column L, paragraph References * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2007.907119 | International search | [X]EP1427146 (NEC INFRONTIA CORP [JP]); | [A]US6941501 (EGUCHI KAZUYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US6999465 (MCDONALD DANIEL J [US], et al); | [A]JP2006108812 (KDDI CORP) |