EP2114611 - FRACTURE RESISTANT FRICTION STIR WELDING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcoa Inc. Alcoa Corporate Center 201 Isabella Street Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Alcoa Inc. Alcoa Corporate Center 201 Isabella Street Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOL, Israel 639 Rock Springs Road Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15228 / US | 02 /
COBES, John, W. 3175 New Hampshire Drive Lower Burrell, Pennsylvania 15068 / US | 03 /
FRIDY, Joseph, M. 137 School Road Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15239 / US | 04 /
CHONTAS, Trent, A. 1036 Ardmore Manor Drive Braddock Hills, Pennsylvania 15221 / US | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Trinks, Ole Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08731408.4 | 05.03.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008US55869 | Priority number, date | US20070893246P | 06.03.2007 Original published format: US 893246 P | US20070868262 | 05.10.2007 Original published format: US 868262 | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008109649 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2114611 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23K20/12, B23K9/32 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
B23K20/1255 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | BRUCHSICHERES REIBSCHWEISSWERKZEUG | [2009/46] | English: | FRACTURE RESISTANT FRICTION STIR WELDING TOOL | [2009/46] | French: | OUTIL DE SOUDAGE PAR FRICTION-MALAXAGE RÉSISTANT À LA FRACTURE | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 11.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/10] | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2006043151 (STOL ISRAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,21,23-25 * paragraphs [0020] , [0060] , [0062] , [0064] , [0066] * [A] 4,17-20,22; | [XA]US2006043152 (STOL ISRAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,21,23-25 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] * [A] 4,11,17-20,22; | [X]US2004035914 (HEMPSTEAD GEORGE D [US]) [X] 6-16 * paragraph [0005]; figures 3a,6 *; | [A]WO0185385 (UNIV BRIGHAM YOUNG [US]) [A] 22 * page 8, line 10 *; | [A]US2004191019 (LEE DAI GIL [KR], et al) [A] 17-20 * paragraph [0026] * |