EP2135175 - SEMANTIC PROCESSOR FOR RECOGNITION OF WHOLE-PART RELATIONS IN NATURAL LANGUAGE DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVENTION MACHINE CORPORATION 800 Boylston Street, 39th Floor Boston, MA 02199 / US | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TODHUNTER, James 14 Mary Agnes Road Framingham, Massachusetts 01701 / US | 02 /
SOVPEL, Igor Flat 193 Building 3/1 Voronyanskogo Street Minsk, 220039 / RU | 03 /
PASTANOHAU, Dzianis Flat 39 Building 78 Serdicha Street Minsk, 220093 / RU | 04 /
VORONTSOV, Alexander Flat 61 Building 7 Yanki Kupaly Street Minsk, 220030 / RU | 05 /
VERTEL, Alexei Flat 5 Building 3 Zolotaya Gorka Street Minsk, 220005 / RU | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Rocke, Carsten Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Rocke, Carsten Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/52] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08732326.7 | 17.03.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008US57183 | Priority number, date | US20070686660 | 15.03.2007 Original published format: US 686660 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008113065 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2135175 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/20, G06F17/30 | [2011/17] | CPC: |
G06F16/345 (EP,US);
G06F40/30 (US);
G06F40/10 (US);
G06F40/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/52] | G06F17/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | SEMANTISCHER PROZESSOR ZUR ERKENNUNG VON GANZTEILBEZIEHUNGEN IN NATÜRLICHEN SPRACHDOKUMENTEN | [2009/52] | English: | SEMANTIC PROCESSOR FOR RECOGNITION OF WHOLE-PART RELATIONS IN NATURAL LANGUAGE DOCUMENTS | [2009/52] | French: | PROCESSEUR SÉMANTIQUE POUR RECONNAISSANCE DE RELATIONS PARTITIVES DANS DES DOCUMENTS EN LANGAGE NATUREL | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 31.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/10] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006041424 (TODHUNTER JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0036]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0050] *; | [Y] - GIRJU R ET AL, "Automatic Discovery of Part-Whole Relations", COMPUTATIONAL LINGUISTICS, MIT Press Cambridge, MA, USA, vol. 32, no. 1, (200603), pages 83 - 135, URL: http://www.mitpressjournals.org/doi/pdf/10.1162/coli.2006.32.1.83, (20110322), XP002629285 [Y] 1-15 * section 3 "Lexico-Syntaxic Patterns that Express Meronymy" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1162/coli.2006.32.1.83 | International search | [A]US2002010574 (TSOURIKOV VALERY [US], et al); | [A]US7120574 (TROYANOVA GALINA [BY], et al) | by applicant | US2006041424 |