EP2135128 - LIGHT SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chroma Technology Corporation P.O. Box 489 10 Imtec Lane Rockingham Vermont 05101 / US | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOCKWELL, Kelly 32 Cemetery Rd. Putney, Vermont 05346 / US | 02 /
KIEGLE, Edward 251 Putnam Hill Rd. Chester, Vermont 05143 / US | 03 /
BROWN, Lance M. 47 South Water St. Vergennes, Vermont 05491 / US | 04 /
COGGER, Jeffrey S. 46 South Maple St. Vergennes, Vermont 05491 / US | 05 /
COULTER, Christopher C. 221 Stonefence Rd. Richmond, Vermont 05477 / US | [2010/07] |
Former [2009/52] | 01 /
STOCKWELL, Kelly Putney, Vermont / US | ||
02 /
KIEGLE, Edward Chester, Vermont / US | |||
03 /
BROWN, Lance M. Vergennes, Vermont / US | |||
04 /
COGGER, Jeffrey S. Vergennes, Vermont / US | |||
05 /
COULTER, Christopher C. Richmond, Vermont / US | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08732569.2 | 20.03.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008US57663 | Priority number, date | US20070919348P | 20.03.2007 Original published format: US 919348 P | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008116070 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2135128 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/06 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
G02B21/16 (EP,US);
H01J7/42 (KR);
G02B21/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTQUELLE | [2009/52] | English: | LIGHT SOURCE | [2009/52] | French: | SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 30.09.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002063955 (NISHIDA HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US3918793 (KRAFT WINFRIED); | [Y]US2002181108 (MACCHI MARCO [IT], et al); | [Y]US4624551 (ANZAI SATORU [JP], et al); | [Y]US6154282 (LILGE LOTHAR [CA], et al) |