EP2140520 - CONDUCTOR HAVING TWO FREQUENCY-SELECTIVE SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 201 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAGAN, Lawrence 13004 S. Madrone Trail Austin, TX 78737-4430 / US | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2010/01] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 08732980.1 | 28.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008US58606 | Priority number, date | US20070908712P | 29.03.2007 Original published format: US 908712 P | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008121789 | Date: | 09.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2140520 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q15/02, H01Q15/00, H01Q19/10, H01Q21/00 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
H01Q21/0018 (EP,US);
H01Q15/02 (KR);
H01Q1/521 (EP,US);
H01Q15/0013 (EP,US);
H01Q15/0026 (EP,US);
H01Q19/10 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | H01Q15/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | LEITER MIT ZWEI FREQUENZSELEKTIVEN OBERFLÄCHEN | [2010/01] | English: | CONDUCTOR HAVING TWO FREQUENCY-SELECTIVE SURFACES | [2010/01] | French: | CONDUCTEUR AYANT DEUX SURFACES SÉLECTIVES DE FRÉQUENCE | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 29.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 27.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2272312 (HARRY TUNICK) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * [A] 12,13; | [Y]US6140972 (JOHNSTON RONALD H [CA], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 1, line 4 - line 8 * * column 2, line 20 - line 27 * * column 2, line 46 - line 56 * * column 4, line 24 - line 65 * * column 6, line 20 - line 58 * * figures 1-3, 7, 8 *; | [Y]US2001050641 (ITOH TATSUO [US], et al) [Y] 1-13* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2005031911 (PENN STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 4 * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 4 * * page 5, line 20 - page 8, line 31 * * figures 1, 2, 4, 5A, 5B * | International search | [Y]US6690327 (MCKINZIE III WILLIAM E [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * entire document *; | [Y]US6476771 (MCKINZIE III WILLIAM E [US]) [Y] 1-7 * entire document *; | [A]US6411261 (LILLY JAMES D [US]) [A] 1-7 * entire document *; | [A]US5917458 (HO THINH Q [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * entire document * | Examination | US4531128 | JPH08204621 | US2006205342 | EP1720396 | - ROBERTO COCCIOLI ET AL, "Aperture-Coupled Patch Antenna on UC-PBG Substrate", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19991101), vol. 47, no. 11, ISSN 0018-9480, XP011037773 | by applicant | US2272312 | US6140972 | WO2005031911 | US2001050641 | US2006205342 | US4531128 | EP1720396 | - "Aperture-Coupled Patch Antenna on UC-PBG Substrate", ROBERTO COCCIOLI ET AL., IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, (19991101), vol. 47 |